EP3624902 - DEVICE FOR ADAPTING A BICYCLE ERGOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koch, Michel 24 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 33200 Bordeaux / FR | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 17720872.5 | 16.03.2017 | [2020/13] | WO2017IB51531 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018167540 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624902 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/00, A63B22/06, A61G5/00, A61G5/10, A63B71/06 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A63B22/0605 (EP);
A61G5/14 (EP);
A63B22/0046 (EP);
A63B22/0087 (EP);
A63B71/0622 (EP);
A61B6/0478 (EP);
A61G2210/50 (EP);
A63B2022/0652 (EP);
A63B2208/0238 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES FAHRRADERGOMETERS | [2020/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADAPTING A BICYCLE ERGOMETER | [2020/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ADAPTER UN CYCLOERGOMÈTRE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2019 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 28.02.2020 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/13] | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE3042087 (PHYSIA GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,5 * pages 6,7; figure - *; | [XYI]US2006234834 (KUO HAI P [TW]) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0025] - [0037]; figure - * [Y] 3,5,6 [I] 2,4,9; | [Y]FR2949193 (ACIME FRAME [FR]) [Y] 3,5,6 * pages 7-11; figure - *; | [I]DE202011050541U (ADELA TECHNOLOGY CO [TW]) [I] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0015] - [0023]; figure - *; | [A]EP2868302 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0020] - [0036]; figure - * |