EP3448734 - WHEEL DETECTOR FOR DETECTING A WHEEL OF A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation (ZWUS) Polska SP. Z O.O Modelarska 12 40-142 Katowice / PL | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÓRNIOCZEK, Marek ul.J. Tuwima 67a 42-680 Tarnowskie Góry / PL | 02 /
ZIELINSKI, Dariusz ul. Szewska 5 43-600 Jaworzno / PL | 03 /
KOPACZ, Andrzej ul. Karpacka 11.55 40-216 Katowice / PL | 04 /
MUSIOL, Grzegorz ul. Swietych Cyryla i Metodego 28/6 41-909 Bytom / PL | 05 /
SZCZEPONIK, Adam ul. Marii Konopnickiej 27 41-500 Chorzów / PL | 06 /
BINCZYK, Kamil ul. Zareby 48/86 43-100 Tychy / PL | 07 /
KOLTON, Wojciech ul. Kochanowskiego 33/8 44-100 Gliwice / PL | 08 /
SAWODNI, Aleksandra ul. Blawatkowa 11/6 41-908 Bytom / PL | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17721106.7 | 27.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017EP60137 | Priority number, date | PL20160417024 | 28.04.2016 Original published format: PL 41702416 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017186886 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448734 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3448734 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61L1/08, B61L1/16, B61L27/00 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
B61L1/165 (EP,EA,US);
B61L1/08 (EP,EA,US);
B61L1/162 (EP,EA,US);
B61L27/30 (EP,EA,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADDETEKTOR ZUM ERFASSEN EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGRADS | [2019/10] | English: | WHEEL DETECTOR FOR DETECTING A WHEEL OF A RAIL VEHICLE | [2019/10] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE ROUE POUR DÉTECTER UNE ROUE DE VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 16.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2017 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | MT | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | TR | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | IE | 27.04.2021 | LU | 27.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | FR | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
TR | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3964703 (WILKAS JOSEPH R, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 9-15 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 29 * * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 36 *; | [A]DE19709840 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line l *; | [A]WO2008138858 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 5, line 31 - page 7, line 27 *; | [A]EP2057056 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1a, 1b, 3 ** paragraphs [0050] - [0054] *; | [A]EP2218624 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0055]; figure 5 * | by applicant | EP1479587 | PL199810B | PL209435B |