EP3452742 - SAFETY VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Farm Technologies GmbH Siemensstrasse 25-27 59199 Bönen / DE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALKENHOL, Reinhard Querweg 61a 33098 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
WIETHOFF, Magnus Sängerhof 6 59514 Welver Dinker / DE | 03 /
FIGGENER, Verena Overbergstr. 75 59302 Oelde / DE | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17721356.8 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017EP60232 | Priority number, date | DE201610108300 | 04.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016108300 | [2019/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017191057 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452742 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452742 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/122, F16K11/044, A01J5/04, A01J7/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
F16K11/044 (EP,US);
A01J5/04 (EP,RU,US);
A01J5/044 (EP,US);
A01J7/02 (EP,RU,US);
F16K11/0445 (RU);
F16K31/122 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | F16K31/122, F16K11/044 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVENTIL | [2019/11] | English: | SAFETY VALVE | [2019/11] | French: | VANNE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 03.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2017 | AL | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | IT | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | GB | 28.04.2021 | IE | 28.04.2021 | LU | 28.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XDAYI]US2015173320 (BALKENHOL REINHOLD [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0073] , [0157] , [0167]; figures 15-25c * [A] 13 [Y] 7-11 [I] 5,6,16-20; | [YD]WO2015091319 (GEA FARM TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [YD] 7-11* figure 3 * | Examination | US2015173320 | WO2015091319 | by applicant | WO2010053577 | US2012017836 | DE102013114595 | US2015173320 |