EP3453086 - LASER DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Court Of The University Of Glasgow Gilbert Scott Building University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGG, Richard University of Glasgow Rankine Building Glasgow G12 8LT / GB | 02 /
CHILDS, David University of Glasgow Rankine Building Glasgow G12 8LT / GB | 03 /
TAYLOR, Richard 5 Brookes Close Kirton in Lindsey Gainsborough DN21 4GD / GB | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/25] |
Former [2019/11] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17721404.6 | 05.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017EP60834 | Priority number, date | GB20160007996 | 06.05.2016 Original published format: GB 201607996 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017191320 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453086 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453086 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/026, H01S5/10, H01S5/14, H01S5/18 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H01S5/185 (EP,US);
H01S5/187 (US);
H01S5/026 (EP,US);
H01S5/0265 (EP,US);
H01S5/0656 (US);
H01S5/11 (EP,US);
H01S5/141 (EP,US);
H01S5/142 (US);
H01S5/34 (US);
H01S2301/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2019/11] | English: | LASER DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION | [2019/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF LASER ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SON EXPLOITATION | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 14.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21173755.6 / EP3893340 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2017 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 23.06.2021 | |
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 23.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1998420 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al) [X] 13-16 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046]; figures 4,5a, 5b * [A] 1-12; | [XA]EP2023454 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 13-16 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0132]; figure 7A * [A] 1-12; | [AD] - JOHN GELLETA ET AL, "Influence of external reflection on the TE mode of photonic crystal surface-emitting lasers", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA - B., US, (20150701), vol. 32, no. 7, doi:10.1364/JOSAB.32.001435, ISSN 0740-3224, page 1435, XP055393532 [AD] 1-16 * page 1435 - page 1436; figures 1,2 * * page 1441 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAB.32.001435 | [A] - R. J. E. TAYLOR ET AL, "Electronic control of coherence in a two-dimensional array of photonic crystal surface emitting lasers", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150820), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep13203, XP055393879 [A] 1-16 * page 1 - page 2; figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep13203 |