EP3472379 - CIRCULAR KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIPRA Patententwicklungs GmbH Emil-Mayer-Strasse 10 72461 Albstadt / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states SIPRA Patententwicklungs- und Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH Emil-Mayer-Strasse 10 72461 Albstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRÄNKLE, Dietmar Lauackerstraße 20 72336 Balingen / DE | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17721633.0 | 03.05.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017EP60492 | Priority number, date | DE201610110981 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016110981 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017215828 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472379 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/60, D04B1/12 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
D04B1/126 (EP,KR,US);
D04B15/60 (EP,KR,US);
D04B1/102 (US);
D04B15/80 (EP);
D04B9/06 (EP);
D04B9/28 (EP);
Y02P70/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | RUNDSTRICKMASCHINE | [2019/17] | English: | CIRCULAR KNITTING MACHINE | [2019/17] | French: | MACHINE À TRICOTER CIRCULAIRE | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1069813 (C. TERROT SÖHNE) [A] 1-20 * figures 2, 6; claims 1-4 *; | [XI]DE1148348 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-5 * [I] 5; | [A]DE1148347 (BILLI GIORGIO) [A] 1-20* column 1; figure 1 *; | [YA]DE1635817 (ICI LTD) [Y] 6,7 * page 4, paragraph letzter - page 6, paragraph zweiter; figure 1 * [A] 1-5,8-20; | [XY]DE2309360 (MECMOR SPA) [X] 1-3,12 * page 4 - page 12; figures 1-12 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]US3774412 (SCHICHMAN D) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XDI]US6058742 (DALMAU GUELL JOSE M A [ES]) [XD] 1-3,8-11,13 * column 3, line 55 - column 8, line 48; figures 1-17 * [I] 14-20 |