EP3448738 - PALLET TRUCK CART TRANSPORTATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Equipment Corporation A Corporation of the State of Ohio 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Crown Equipment Corporation A Corporation Of The State Of Ohio 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGES, Clinton c/o Crown Equipment Corporation Legal Dept. 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | 02 /
HICKMAN, David c/o Crown Equipment Corporation Legal Dept. 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | 03 /
MAGOTO, Daniel c/o Crown Equipment Corporation Legal Dept. 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17722300.5 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US29574 | Priority number, date | US201662329694P | 29.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662329694 P | US201662384158P | 06.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384158 P | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017189685 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448738 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/06, B62B3/10 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
B62B3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B62B3/0612 (US);
B60P3/073 (EP,KR,US);
B62B3/10 (EP,KR,US);
B65D19/0004 (US);
B65D19/44 (US);
B62B2202/92 (EP,KR,US);
B62B2203/70 (KR,US);
B65D2519/00805 (US);
B65D2519/00815 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | PALETTENHUBWAGENTRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG | [2019/10] | English: | PALLET TRUCK CART TRANSPORTATION DEVICE | [2019/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE CHARIOTS À PALETTES | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 26.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | EP19204945.0 / EP3643581 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4032165 (RUSSELL HERMAN F) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1022185 (MAGLINE INC [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US2013189046 (BARTELS ALAN WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |