EP3458758 - FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/13] | FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT | ||
[2023/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖRG, Christian Gernbergweg 5 86862 Dillishausen / DE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17722479.7 | 15.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP61568 | Priority number, date | EP20160170053 | 18.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16170053 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198591 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458758 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458758 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/04, A62C2/06, E04G15/06, F16L5/10, H02G3/04, H02G3/22 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A62C2/065 (EP,US);
E04G15/061 (EP,US);
F16L5/04 (EP,US);
F16L5/10 (EP,US);
H02G3/0412 (EP,US);
B29C44/367 (US);
H02G3/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRANDSCHUTZELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BRANDSCHUTZELEMENTS | [2019/13] | English: | FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT | [2023/24] | French: | ÉLEMENT IGNIFUGE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT IGNIFUGE | [2023/24] |
Former [2019/13] | FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A FIRE PROTECTION ELEMENT | ||
Former [2019/13] | ÉLÉMENT IGNIFUGE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT IGNIFUGE | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 18.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29712909U (SCHOETTLER LUNOS LUEFTUNG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figure - *; | [YA]DE19806012 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 8,9 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 41 * * figure - * [A] 1-7,10-15; | [A]EP1293714 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003192269 (RADKE DUWAYNE C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] * * figures 6, 7 *; | [A]EP2570157 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 13-15* column 10, line 26 - line 34 *; | [X]EP2682657 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1-3,7,10,11 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2a,2b *; | [XYI]EP2689808 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 5,6,13-15 |