EP3448422 - TREATMENT OF CANINE ATOPIC DERMATITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elanco US, Inc. 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2023/42] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Benchmark Animal Health Limited Benchmark House 8 Smithy Wood Drive Sheffield S35 1QN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARS, Kaspars Rigas rajons Olaines pag. "Viksnas" LV2127 Jaunolaine / LV | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17723294.9 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017EP59977 | Priority number, date | EP20160167264 | 27.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16167264 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017186813 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448422 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/35, C07K14/005, C07K14/08, C07K16/24 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/385 (KR);
A61K39/0008 (KR,US);
A61K39/35 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (CN,KR);
A61P17/00 (CN,KR);
A61P29/00 (CN,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K14/08 (EP,EA,US);
C07K16/244 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12N7/00 (KR,US);
A61K2039/5158 (KR);
A61K2039/5256 (KR,US);
A61K2039/5258 (CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/552 (KR,US);
A61K2039/58 (KR);
A61K2039/6031 (KR);
C12N2760/00022 (KR,US);
C12N2760/00023 (KR,US);
C12N2760/00034 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ATOPISCHER HUNDEDERMATITIS | [2019/10] | English: | TREATMENT OF CANINE ATOPIC DERMATITIS | [2019/10] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA DERMATITE ATOPIQUE CANINE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 08.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006032674 (CYTOS BIOTECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2016062720 (SAIBA GMBH [CH]); | by applicant | WO03024481 | WO2007068747 | WO2015042596 | EP20140189897 |