EP3453023 - MOLTEN FUEL NUCLEAR REACTOR WITH NEUTRON REFLECTING COOLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue, Washington 98008 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEATHAM, Jesse, R., III c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 02 /
CZERWINSKI, Ken c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 03 /
EL-DASHER, Bassem, S. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 04 /
KERLIN, William, M. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 05 /
PETROSKI, Robert, C. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 06 /
WALTER, Joshua, C. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 07 /
ABBOTT, Ryan c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 08 /
CISNEROS, Anselmo, T., Jr. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 09 /
FLOWERS, Dan c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 10 /
FREEMAN, Charles, Gregory c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 11 /
HAVSTAD, Mark, A. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 12 /
JOHNS, Christopher, J. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 13 /
KELLEHER, Brian, C. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 14 /
KRAMER, Kevin c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 15 /
LATKOWSKI, Jeffery, F. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | 16 /
MCWHIRTER, Jon, D. c/o TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue WA 98008 / US | [2022/12] |
Former [2019/11] | 01 /
CHEATHAM, Jesse, R., III c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | ||
02 /
CZERWINSKI, Ken c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
03 /
EL-DASHER, Bassem, S. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
04 /
KERLIN, William, M. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
05 /
PETROSKI, Robert, C. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
06 /
WALTER, Joshua, C. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
07 /
ABBOTT, Ryan c/o TerraPower, LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | |||
08 /
CISNEROS, Anselmo, T., Jr. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
09 /
FLOWERS, Dan c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
10 /
FREEMAN, Charles, Gregory c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | |||
11 /
HAVSTAD, Mark, A. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
12 /
JOHNS, Christopher, J. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
13 /
KELLEHER, Brian, C. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
14 /
KRAMER, Kevin c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
15 /
LATKOWSKI, Jeffery, F. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | |||
16 /
MCWHIRTER, Jon, D. c/o TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE Suite 100 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17723587.6 | 02.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017US30666 | Priority number, date | US201662330726P | 02.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662330726 P | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017192607 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453023 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453023 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G21C1/22, G21C3/24, G21C3/54, G21C1/14, G21C5/14, G21C11/06, G21C15/12, G21C15/243, G21C15/26 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
G21C1/14 (EP,EA,US);
G21C15/12 (EP,EA,KR);
G21C1/326 (EA,KR,US);
G21C1/03 (EA,US);
G21C1/22 (EP,EA,KR,US);
G21C1/328 (EA,KR);
G21C11/06 (EP,EA,KR,US);
G21C15/02 (EA,US);
G21C15/14 (EA,KR);
G21C15/243 (EP,EA,US);
G21C15/25 (EA,KR);
G21C15/26 (EP,EA,US);
G21C15/28 (EA,KR,US);
G21C3/24 (EP,EA,KR);
G21C3/54 (EP,EA,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | G21C1/22, G21C3/24, G21C3/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMELZBRENNSTOFFKERNREAKTOR MIT NEUTRONENREFLEKTIERENDEM KÜHLMITTEL | [2021/46] | English: | MOLTEN FUEL NUCLEAR REACTOR WITH NEUTRON REFLECTING COOLANT | [2019/11] | French: | RÉACTEUR NUCLÉAIRE À COMBUSTIBLE FONDU DOTÉ D'UN LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT RÉFLÉCHISSANT LES NEUTRONS | [2019/11] |
Former [2019/11] | SCHMELZBRENNSTOFFKERNREAKTOR NEUTRONENREFLEKTIERENDEM KÜHLMITTEL | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 13.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2017 | AL | 23.03.2022 | AT | 23.03.2022 | CY | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | ES | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | IT | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | MK | 23.03.2022 | MT | 23.03.2022 | NL | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | TR | 23.03.2022 | IE | 02.05.2022 | LU | 02.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
TR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 02.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
AT | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.03.2022 | |
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2874106 (PHILIP HAMMOND R, et al) [X] 1,2,5-13,16,17,22-26 * the whole document * [Y] 4,19 [I] 3,14,15,18,20,21,27,28; | [X]US3136700 (POPPENDIEK HEINZ F, et al) [X] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3383285 (TUNSTALL ACKROYD RONALD, et al) [Y] 4,19* the whole document * | Examination | CA631890 | US3018239 |