EP3455361 - METHODS FOR OPTIMISING METABOLITE PRODUCTION IN GENETICALLY MODIFIED PLANTS AND FOR PROCESSING THESE PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basf Plant Science Company GmbH Carl-Bosch Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRE, Carl 26 Davis Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
CAVENDER, Anthony J 2901 South Loop Drive Ames, IA 50010 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17723674.2 | 12.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017EP61427 | Priority number, date | EP20160169443 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16169443 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017194728 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455361 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01G1/00, G06F19/00, A01H5/00 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/8247 (EP,US);
A23D9/02 (US);
A01D45/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER METABOLITENPRODUKTION IN GENETISCH VERÄNDERTEN PFLANZEN UND ZUR VERARBEITUNG DIESER PFLANZEN | [2019/12] | English: | METHODS FOR OPTIMISING METABOLITE PRODUCTION IN GENETICALLY MODIFIED PLANTS AND FOR PROCESSING THESE PLANTS | [2019/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'OPTIMISATION DE LA PRODUCTION DE MÉTABOLITES DANS DES PLANTES GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉES ET DE TRAITEMENT DE CES PLANTES | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 12.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]CA2196940 (CARGILL INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 9 - page 7, line 22; claim - * [Y] 2-8; | [XY]US5884225 (ALLEN MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 10 - line 27 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 62; claim - * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]WO2007096387 (BASF PLANT SCIENCE [DE], et al) [Y] 14-20 * page 1, line 5 - line 16 * * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 18 * * page 30, line 12 - page 35, line 12; examples 9,12; claim - *; | [XDY] - NAZIR A KHAN ET AL, "Changes in fatty acid content and composition in silage maize during grain filling", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, GB, (20110215), vol. 91, no. 6, doi:10.1002/jsfa.4279, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 1041 - 1049, XP055292968 [XD] 1 * page 1042, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1046, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 1048, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 2,3; tables 3,4 * [Y] 2-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.4279 | [YDA] - Perry Miller ET AL, "Using Growing Degree Days to Predict Plant Stages", Montguide, (20010701), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://store.msuextension.org/publications/AgandNaturalResources/MT200103AG.pdf, (20160802), XP055292965 [YD] 14-20 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 2, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1 * [A] 2-8 | [A] - RICHARD P. HASLAM ET AL, "The modification of plant oil composition via metabolic engineering-better nutrition by design", PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, GB, (20121016), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1111/pbi.12012, ISSN 1467-7644, pages 157 - 168, XP055293679 [A] 2-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/pbi.12012 | [A] - LIANNE M. DWYER ET AL, "A General Thermal Index for Maize", JOURNAL AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AGRONOMY, US, (19990101), vol. 91, no. 6, doi:10.2134/agronj1999.916940x, ISSN 0095-9650, page 940, XP055396896 [A] 1-8,14-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2134/agronj1999.916940x | [A] - LIANNE M. DWYER ET AL, "Guidelines for Comparisons among Different Maize Maturity Rating Systems", JOURNAL AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AGRONOMY, US, (19990101), vol. 91, no. 6, doi:10.2134/agronj1999.916946x, ISSN 0095-9650, page 946, XP055396895 [A] 1-8,14-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2134/agronj1999.916946x | by applicant | US5411561 | WO0042195 | WO2004017467 | WO2005103253 | US7047690 | - SWANSON ET AL., ADV NUTR, (2012), vol. 3, pages 1 - 7 | - BAUX ET AL., EUROP. J. AGRONOMY, (2008), vol. 29, pages 102 - 107 | - KHAN ET AL., J. SCI FOOD AGRI., (2011), vol. 91, pages 1041 - 1049 | - SCHULTE ET AL., INDUSTRIAL CROPS AND PRODUCTS, (2013), vol. 51, pages 212 - 219 | - PAVLISTA ET AL., INDUSTRIAL CROPS PRODUCTS, (2011), vol. 33, pages 451 - 456 | - JEH ET AL., KOREAN J CHEM. ENGINEERING, (2008), vol. 25, pages 1103 - 1109 | - DENG; SCARTH, JAOCS, (1998), vol. 75, pages 759 - 766 | - FOWLER; DOWNEY, CAN. J. PLANT. SCI., (1970), vol. 50, pages 233 - 247 | - SPRECHER ET AL., J. LIPID RES., (1995), vol. 36, pages 2471 - 2477 | - ABBADI ET AL., EUR. J. LIPID. SCI. TECHNOL., (2001), vol. 103, pages 106 - 113 | - MORITA ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2000), vol. 28, pages 872 - 879 | - YU ET AL., LIPIDS, (2000), vol. 35, pages 1061 - 1064 | - QI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2004), vol. 22, pages 739 - 745 | - ABBADI ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2004), vol. 16, pages 2734 - 2748 | - WU ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1013 - 1017 | - VERA ET AL., CANADIAN J. PLANT SCI, (2007), vol. 87, pages 13 - 26 | WO2015EP76631 |