EP3459325 - METHOD FOR COVERING AN ELECTRIC UNIT, AND ELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestr. 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEBRICHER, Lothar Saalburgstrasse 19B 61440 Oberursel / DE | 02 /
HUBER, Dietmar Wingertstraße 43c 63322 Rödermark / DE | 03 /
RAUKOPF, Svenja Höhenweg 33 35329 Gemünden Felda - Hainbach / DE | 04 /
SCHILLINGER, Jakob Lisztstraße 9 85080 Gaimersheim / DE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 17723679.1 | 12.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP61500 | Priority number, date | DE201610208783 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016208783 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198570 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459325 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3459325 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H05K3/00, G01D11/24, H01L23/31 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H05K1/186 (EP);
G01D11/245 (EP);
H01L23/3107 (EP);
H01L23/3135 (EP);
H05K3/0014 (EP);
H05K2203/1316 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM UMMANTELN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN EINHEIT UND ELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT | [2019/13] | English: | METHOD FOR COVERING AN ELECTRIC UNIT, AND ELECTRIC COMPONENT | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ENROBER UNE UNITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE ET COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102007057904 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [XI]US2013106408 (TSUGE HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2013154626 (TAKASAKI MITSURU [JP], et al) |