EP3458121 - FLEXIBLE MEDICAL TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/13] | FLEXIBLE TUBE | ||
[2022/48] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENERONI, Alain 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
FINI, Massimo 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
REITER, Reinhold 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
LAUER, Martin 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2023/45] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
VENERONI, Alain Via Roma 37 26016 Spino d'Adda / IT | ||
02 /
FINI, Massimo Via Picasso 31 41037 Mirandola / IT | |||
03 /
REITER, Reinhold Via Bambini del Mondo 35 26013 Crema / IT | |||
04 /
LAUER, Martin Auf dem Hollerstock 8 66606 St. Wendel / DE | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2019/13] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17723718.7 | 19.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP62109 | Priority number, date | EP20160001169 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16001169 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198817 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458121 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458121 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/04, A61L29/08, A61L29/14, A61M39/08, A61M39/10, A61M39/12, A61M39/14 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61L29/141 (EP);
A61L29/041 (EP);
A61L29/085 (EP);
A61M39/08 (EP);
A61M39/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/041, C08L23/12 (EP);
A61L29/041, C08L27/06 (EP);
A61L29/085, C08L53/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER MEDIZINISCHER SCHLAUCH | [2023/26] | English: | FLEXIBLE MEDICAL TUBE | [2022/48] | French: | TUBE MÉDICAL FLEXIBLE | [2022/48] |
Former [2019/13] | FLEXIBLES ROHR | ||
Former [2019/13] | FLEXIBLE TUBE | ||
Former [2019/13] | TUBE FLEXIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 17.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.2024
08.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2024/20] | 18.09.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005218649 ; | [A]JP2006130144 ; | [X]WO8300699 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [XI]US2004059063 (YANG TAHUA [US], et al); | [A]US2009299260 (KREISCHER THOMAS [DE], et al); | [I]US2010274168 (GRONAU SOEREN [DE], et al); | by applicant | US4417753 | DE102005024621 | EP2001670 | WO2010121819 | Opposition | EP0577125 | WO03099354 | US7762977 | US2012021151 | EP2698174 |