EP3639435 - FLEXIBLE RETRANSMISSION-PROCESS BUFFER MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOSRAVIRAD, Saeed Reza Podwale 2/89 50043 Wroclaw / PL | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Klaus Ingemann Blegkilde Alle 67 2. sal lejl 01 9000 Aalborg / DK | 03 /
STEINER, Jens Holger Bachsvej 11 9270 Klarup / DK | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 17723998.5 | 16.05.2017 | [2020/17] | WO2017EP61700 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018210407 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639435 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/1835 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE NEUÜBERTRAGUNGSPROZESSPUFFERVERWALTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | FLEXIBLE RETRANSMISSION-PROCESS BUFFER MANAGEMENT | [2020/17] | French: | GESTION DE TAMPON DE PROCESSUS DE RETRANSMISSION FLEXIBLE | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2086152 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18,21-44,47-53 * abstract * * figures 3A, 3B, 5 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0032] - [0 36] - [0042] - [0 53] * [I] 19,20,45,46; | [XA]US2010262886 (REN JING-FEI [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-11,13-15,18,21,23,24,26-28,30,31,33,35-37,39-41,44,47,49,50,52,53 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0042] * [A] 3,6,8,12,16,17,19,20,22,25,29,32,34,38,42,43,45,46,48,51; | [XA]WO2010069379 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-11,13-15,18,21,23,24,26-28,30,31,33,35-37,39-41,44,47,49,50,52,53 * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 8, lines 11-26 * * page 15, lines 9-17 * * page 19, lines 22-29 * * page 22, line 29 - page 23, line 11 * [A] 3,6,8,12,16,17,19,20,22,25,29,32,34,38,42,43,45,46,48,51; | [XA]US8843812 (TANG XIANGYU [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-11,13-15,18,21,23,24,26-28,30,31,33,35-37,39-41,44,47,49,50,52,53 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 28 * [A] 3,6,8,12,16,17,19,20,22,25,29,32,34,38,42,43,45,46,48,51 |