EP3430013 - CARBAPENEM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orchid Pharma Limited Orchid Towers 313 Valluvar Kottam High Road Nungambakkam Chennai 600 034 TN / IN | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2023/45] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Orchid Pharma Limited Orchid Towers 313 Valluvar Kottam High Road Nungambakkam Chennai 600 034 TN / IN | ||
For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Gopalan Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 02 /
PAUL-SATYASEELA, Maneesh 410 Hara Vijaya Heights BWSSB Pipeline Road Uttarahalli Manevarthekaval Banashankari 6th Stage Bengaluru 560062 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
SRINIVASAN, Chidambaram, Venkateswaran Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 04 /
IYER, Sridhar, Ramanathan 504 Parsn Aahana Mambakkam Road Vengaivasal Sithalapakkam Post Chennai 600126 / IN | 05 /
PERIASAMY, Hariharan Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 06 /
PARAMESWARAN, Venkatesan Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 07 /
THIRUNAVUKKARASU, Bharani Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 08 /
GUNTURU, Prabhakar, Rao Gowrigudem (VIII) Sidharam (PO) Khammam (Dt) Telangana - 507303 / IN | 09 /
DESHKUMAR, Manjula, Devi Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 10 /
JAKKALA, Venkateshwarlu Orchid Pharma Ltd 476/14 Old Mahabalipuram Road Sozhanganallur Chennai-600119 Tamilnadu / IN | 11 /
NARGUND, Ravi, P. c/o Merck Sharp&Dohme Corp. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth NJ 07033 / US | 12 /
MILLER, Michael 1862 Lamberts Mill Road Scotch Plains NJ 07076 / US | 13 /
SINGH, Sheo 19 Firethorn Drive Edison NJ 08820 / US | 14 /
DONG, Shuzhi c/o Merck Sharp&Dohme Corp. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth NJ 07033 / US | 15 /
WANG, Hongwu c/o Merck Sharp&Dohme Corp. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth NJ 07033 / US | 16 /
YOUNG, Katherine c/o Merck Sharp&Dohme Corp. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth NJ 07033 / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/46] |
Former [2019/04] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17724297.1 | 15.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017IN00060 | Priority number, date | IN201641009127 | 16.03.2016 Original published format: IN201641009127 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017158616 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3430013 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3430013 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/407, A61P31/00 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/407 (IL,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
C07D519/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | 14.09.2018 | ME | 14.09.2018 | Validation states | MA | 14.09.2018 | MD | 14.09.2018 | Title | German: | CARBAPENEMVERBINDUNGEN | [2019/04] | English: | CARBAPENEM COMPOUNDS | [2019/04] | French: | COMPOSES DE CARBAPENEM | [2023/01] |
Former [2019/04] | COMPOSÉS DE CARBAPÉNÈME | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 14.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0372582 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) | by applicant | US4194047 | EP0126587 | EP0579826 | EP0528678 |