EP3463733 - PRODUCTION LINE FOR SOLDERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser SE+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIPPIN, Christoph Niederholzstr. 6 79639 Grenzach / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Hahn, Christian, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland)AG +Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 17724543.8 | 17.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP61806 | Priority number, date | DE201610110040 | 31.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016110040 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017207272 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3463733 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/047, B23K1/00, B23K1/008, H05K3/34 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B23K3/0478 (EP,US);
B23K1/0016 (EP,US);
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
B23K3/08 (US);
H05K3/0085 (US);
H05K3/3494 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | FERTIGUNGSLINIE ZUM LÖTEN | [2019/15] | English: | PRODUCTION LINE FOR SOLDERING | [2019/15] | French: | LIGNE DE FABRICATION POUR LE BRASAGE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 18.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 26.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE29617213U (SMT MASCHINENGESELLSCHAFT MBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1-2 * [I] 6,7,13-15; | [XI]WO9923864 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 4, line 11 - page 5; figures 1,3 * [I] 6,7,13-15; | [Y]US6168064 (BERKIN GEORGE MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 12* column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 43; figures 5,6 *; | [XYI]WO2005043758 (REHM ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 12 - page 15; figures 1a-2b * * page 17 * * page 18 - page 19 * [Y] 12 [I] 6,7,13-15 |