EP3251462 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MULTICAST COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/49] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING MULTICAST COMMUNICATION | ||
[2019/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Qianxi No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhang No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
SORRENTINO, Stefano Hannebergsgatan 32 SE-171 68 Solna / SE | 04 /
BELLESCHI, Marco Framnäsbacken 8 SE-171 66 Solna / SE | 05 /
ENBUSKE, Henrik Norrbackagatan 4 3tr. SE-113 41 Stockholm / SE | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2019/33] |
Former [2017/49] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17724714.5 | 14.03.2017 | [2017/49] | WO2017CN76657 | Priority number, date | WO2016CN78392 | 01.04.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/078392 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017167012 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251462 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3251462 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04W76/40 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W76/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | H04W76/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2017/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR MULTICAST-KOMMUNIKATION | [2019/17] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MULTICAST COMMUNICATION | [2019/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR COMMUNICATIONS EN MULTIDIFFUSION | [2019/17] |
Former [2017/49] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR MULTICAST-KOMMUNIKATION | ||
Former [2017/49] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING MULTICAST COMMUNICATION | ||
Former [2017/49] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FAVORISER LES COMMUNICATIONS MULTIDIFFUSION | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2017 | Translation filed | 31.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 31.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2017 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | IE | 14.03.2020 | LU | 14.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ZTE, "Discussion on the eMBMS based V2X broadcast", vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-161430 DISCUSSION ON THE EMBMS BASED V2X BROADCAST, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160214), XP051055314 [I] 1-22 * paragraph [02.2] - paragraph [02.3] * | [I] - CATT, "Discussion on V2X architecture", vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-161190, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160214), XP051055162 [I] 1-22 * paragraph [02.2] * | [I] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on architecture enhancements for LTE support of V2X services (Release 14)", 3GPP TR 23.785 V0.2.0, (20160201), pages 1 - 21, URL: https://portal.3gpp.org/desktopmodules/Specifications/SpecificationDetails.aspx?specificationId=3006, (20171102), XP055421168 [I] 1-22 * paragraph [6.3.2] * | [A] - ZTE, "Localized Uu based V2X architecture concerning on eMBMS", vol. RAN WG3, no. Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-160206, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20160214), XP051056082 [A] 1-22 * Proposal 3. * | International search | [A]WO2011060707 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [X]WO2012092250 (MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2012092097 (MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2013250771 (YU LING [FI], et al); | [A]US2014064177 (ANCHAN KIRANKUMAR [US]); | [A]WO2014193959 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]CN104936264 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM, et al) |