EP3622581 - A BROADBAND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLITSIDAS, Christos Amanuensvägen 3 Lgh 1312, 4th floor 114 16 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
JONSSON, Lars Bräckegatan 3 162 61 Vällingby / SE | 03 /
ENGSTRÖM, Stefan Äppelblomsvägen 8 139 32 Värmdö / SE | 04 /
KYRIACOU, Georgios A Evmoiro 67100 Xanthi / GR | 05 /
BANTAVIS, Petros 73 Jules Guesde 29200 Brest / FR | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 17724954.7 | 12.05.2017 | [2020/12] | WO2017SE50483 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018208196 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3622581 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3622581 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/08, H01Q21/06 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H01Q13/085 (EP);
H01Q21/064 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0006 (US);
H01Q21/24 (US);
H01Q1/246 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREITBANDANTENNE | [2020/12] | English: | A BROADBAND ANTENNA | [2020/12] | French: | ANTENNE À LARGE BANDE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 11.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6008770 (SUGAWARA SATORU [JP]) [Y] 5,6,8,9,11,16 * column 13, line 28 - line 65 * * figure 21 *; | [A]US2007152898 (MIZUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0062]; figures 7,10 *; | [IY]US2013021218 (ASANUMA KENICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,12,13,15-18 * figures 5,17,18,29,30 * * paragraphs [0108] , [0109] , [0115] - [0118] - [0132] * [Y] 3-6,8,9,11,14-16; | [YA]US2014285388 (PENG SHENG YENG [US]) [Y] 3,4,14,15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 9,10 * [A] 1; | [YA]WO2016141177 (MASSACHUSETTS UNIV OF [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,14,15 * figure 3 * [A] 1 | by applicant | - J. SHIN; D.H. SCHAUBERT, "A parameter study of stripline-fed vivaldi notch-antenna arrays", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, (199905), vol. 47, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/8.774151, pages 879 - 886, XP000845908 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/8.774151 |