EP3455406 - DRY PROCESSED CELLULOSE FIBERS FOR PAPERMAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WestRock MWV, LLC 1000 Abernathy Road NE Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOX, David E. 2609 Branston Way Apex, North Carolina 27539 / US | 02 /
HART, Peter W. 3 Bohler Pt NW Atlanta, Georgia 30327 / US | 03 /
MOYNIHAN, Humphrey J. 115 Lakewood Lane Covington, Virginia 24426 / US | 04 /
KILGORE, Nichole 1842 Monument Ave 2 Richmond, Virginia 23220 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17725138.6 | 15.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017US32648 | Priority number, date | US201662335935P | 13.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662335935 P | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017197384 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455406 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/30, D21H11/16, D21H17/25, D21H21/22, D21H21/52, C08L1/02 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
D21H17/25 (EP,US);
C08L1/02 (EP,US);
D21H11/16 (EP,US);
D21H19/00 (US);
D21H21/22 (EP,US);
D21H21/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | TROCKENVERARBEITETE CELLULOSEFASERN ZUR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2019/12] | English: | DRY PROCESSED CELLULOSE FIBERS FOR PAPERMAKING | [2019/12] | French: | FIBRES DE CELLULOSE TRAITÉES À SEC POUR LA FABRICATION DE PAPIER | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 07.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US1910406 (RICHTER GEORGE A) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,12-19,21,23,24,26,27 * claims 1-10 * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 11 * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 92 * [I] 3-5,7-11,15-18; | [X]FR2282016 (WITCEL SACIFIA [AR]) [X] 19 * page 1, line 31 - line 36 * * page 2, line 4 - line 11 * * claims 1-5; table 2 *; | [X]US5227024 (GOMEZ DANIEL [FR]) [X] 19,20,23-27 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 66 * * column 9, line 35 - line 67 * * column 6, line 50 - line 57 * * column 10, line 1 - line 11 * * column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 15 * * claims 1-5 *; | [XI]AT410683B (ANDRITZ AG MASCHF [AT]) [X] 19,21 * figure 1; claims 1-11 * * page 3, line 30 - line 40 * * page 4, line 19 - line 28 * [I] 23-27; | [XI]US2013012857 (FLYNN NIGEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-11,19,21,22 * abstract * * claims 1-22 * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 2; | [A]US2014145017 (UEMATSU TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * claims 1-20 ** paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0198] *; | [XI]WO2015154692 (CHINESE ACAD TECH INST PHYSICS [CN]) [X] 1,3-5,19,21,22 * paragraph [0014]; examples 1, 2, 4; claims 1-10 * [I] 2,12-14; | [P]EP3130435 (TECHNICAL INST OF PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF THE CHINESE ACAD OF SCIENCES [CN]) | by applicant | US8142887 | US8349443 | US8916636 |