EP3449488 - X-RAY DETECTOR ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/10] | RADIATION SHIELDING SYSTEM FOR X-RAY DETECTOR ARRAY | ||
[2021/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Susanne, Madeline 100 Stone Clay Road North Greenbush, NY 12198 / US | 02 /
ALBAGLI, Douglas 1 Queensbury Court Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
GENT, James, Michael 3000 N. Grandview Blvd W622 Waukesha, WI 53188 / US | 04 /
KINSEY, Kevin, Edward W304S3236 Brookhill Rd Waukesha, WI 53189 / US | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Baker Hughes 245 Hammersmith Chalk Hill Road London W6 8DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17725381.2 | 25.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US29490 | Priority number, date | US201662326989P | 25.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662326989 P | US201715495142 | 24.04.2017 Original published format: US201715495142 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017189630 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3449488 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G21F3/00, G21F1/12, G01T1/20, G01T1/24, H01L27/146 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
G21F1/125 (EP,US);
G21F1/085 (US);
G01T1/2019 (EP,US);
G01T1/24 (US);
G21F3/00 (EP,US);
H01L27/14623 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | RÖNTGENSTRAHLENDETEKTORARRAY | [2021/16] | English: | X-RAY DETECTOR ARRAY | [2021/16] | French: | RÉSEAU DE DÉTECTEURS DE RAYONS X | [2021/16] |
Former [2019/10] | STRAHLUNGSABSCHIRMUNGSSYSTEM FÜR RÖNTGENSTRAHLENDETEKTORARRAY | ||
Former [2019/10] | RADIATION SHIELDING SYSTEM FOR X-RAY DETECTOR ARRAY | ||
Former [2019/10] | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES RAYONNEMENTS POUR UN RÉSEAU DE DÉTECTEURS DE RAYONS X | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 26.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009121146 (LUHTA RANDALL P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8-11,14,17-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] , [0035] - [0038] - [0054] * [I] 3,4,12,16; | [XI]US2013048867 (COK RONALD STEVEN [US]) [X] 1,2,6,9-11,14,17-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0055] , [0056] *[I] 3,4,7,12-16; | [XI]US2013101081 (YAOI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,14,18,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0040] - [0042] * [I] 3,4,12,13,15,16 |