EP3464928 - VEHICLE-COOLING FRONT PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/15] | VIBRATION-FILTERING AND RETAINING MOUNT FOR A MEMBER OF A VEHICLE-COOLING FRONT PANEL | ||
[2020/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2020/46] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIEIRA, Bruno 35 RUE DE LA SENETTE 78955 CARRIERES SOUS POISSY / FR | 02 /
MARCAIS, Philippe 2 RUE DU TEMPLE 78500 SARTROUVILLE / FR | 03 /
MOIGNARD, Jeremy 13 AVENUE DUPONANT 92390 VILLENEUVE LA GARENNE / FR | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17725673.2 | 27.04.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017FR50996 | Priority number, date | FR20160054624 | 24.05.2016 Original published format: FR 1654624 | [2019/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017203113 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464928 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464928 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/36, B62D25/08, B60K11/04 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP);
F16F1/373 (EP);
B60Y2306/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKÜHLFRONTPLATTE | [2020/14] | English: | VEHICLE-COOLING FRONT PANEL | [2020/14] | French: | FAÇADE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE VÉHICULE | [2020/14] |
Former [2019/15] | SCHWINGUNGSFILTERUNGS- UND RÜCKHALTEMONTAGE FÜR EIN ELEMENT EINER FAHRZEUGKÜHLFRONTPLATTE | ||
Former [2019/15] | VIBRATION-FILTERING AND RETAINING MOUNT FOR A MEMBER OF A VEHICLE-COOLING FRONT PANEL | ||
Former [2019/15] | PLOT DE MAINTIEN ET DE FILTRATION VIBRATOIRE D'UN ORGANE D'UNE FAÇADE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2017 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | IT | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | NL | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | IE | 27.04.2021 | LU | 27.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3123170 (BRYANT) [X] 1,2 * figures 6-9 * [A] 3-5,8 [I] 9,10; | [XAYI]GB2173459 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1,7,8 * [A] 3-5,8 [Y] 10 [I] 6,9; | [XAYI]US5558310 (FURUIE TSUNEICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3-5,8 [Y] 10 [I] 6,9; | [XAI]FR2864817 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,7 * figures 1,2 * [A] 3-5,8 [I] 2,6,9; | [X]WO2012020185 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-5* figures 3a-3c *; | [X]FR2963759 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * figures 1-4 * |