Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3439637

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Validation states MA 
 MD 
Examination procedure25.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase27.09.2018National basic fee paid 
27.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted01.06.2022
Opposition procedure14.04.2025Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Appeal following opposition05.02.2025APPEAL FILED
05.02.2025DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE
04.04.2025APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20180927
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:11.01.2019 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:11.01.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:13.10.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:07.06.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:17.11.2021 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:17.11.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:15.12.2021 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20211118
 
Event date:29.03.2022 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:29.04.2022 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:29.04.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.06.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602017057996 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:15.06.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1494914 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20220615
 
Event date:15.06.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:22.06.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:10.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:29.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20220826
 
Event date:30.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 3439637 PT 20220830 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20220823
 
Event date:20.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:03.10.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION]
Effective DATE:20220601
 
Event date:12.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI FGE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND
 
Event date:30.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG MA VAGR 43793 MA B1
Code Expl.:+VALIDATION OF EP PATENT IN VALIDATION STATE [INFORMATION PROVIDED BY NATIONAL OFFICE]
 
Event date:11.10.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2924881 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20221011
 
Event date:26.10.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20220401691 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20221010
 
Event date:31.10.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG MD VAGR 3439637 MD 20221031 T2
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF VALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:17.10.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E022537 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20220822
 
Event date:10.11.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 40351 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:28.11.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E059531 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:04.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20221073 HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:25.11.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20221073 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:24.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:24.02.2023 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:22.02.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602017057996 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:15.03.2023 
Event description:NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2
 
Event date:29.03.2023 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:ELKINGTON AND FIFE LLP
Effective DATE:20230222
 
Event date:31.03.2023 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20220601
 
Event date:14.04.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20221073 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20230302
Year of Fee Payment:7
 
Event date:31.05.2023 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:ALFASIGMA S.P.A.
 
Event date:31.05.2023 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO VALIDATION STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MD
Payment DATE:20230216
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:14.06.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230418
 
Event date:28.06.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2
 
Event date:20.09.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2
 
Event date:17.11.2023 
Event description:REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3
 
Event date:29.02.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20230227
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:12.04.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20221073 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20240301
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20240223
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20240215
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20240326
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO VALIDATION STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MD
Payment DATE:20240214
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20240213
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20240313
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20240222
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20240214
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Payment DATE:20240319
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20240320
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.06.2024 
Event description:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Effective DATE:20220818
 
Event date:28.06.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20220601
 
Event date:10.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240206
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:11.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20240411
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:18.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20240501
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:22.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20240509
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:23.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20240326
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20240412
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20240220
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20240422
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:25.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20240327
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Payment DATE:20240404
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:07.02.2025 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O
 
Event date:26.02.2025 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO
 
Event date:17.03.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20250218
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:10.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20250327
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20250214
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20250224
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20250328
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:15.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20250227
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:15.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Payment DATE:20250227
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:15.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20250226
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20250219
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20250326
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20221073 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20250224
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:22.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20250211
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:22.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20250211
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:08.04.2025 
Event description:APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20250225
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20250318
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20250219
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20250318
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20250219
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:25.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20250210
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:25.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20250212
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:25.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20250328
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20250213
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20250320
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20250224
Year of Fee Payment:09