EP3452372 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING LARGE BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haver & Boecker OHG Carl-Haver-Platz 3 59302 Oelde / DE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜGGE, Thomas Hedwigstraße 5 59302 Oelde / DE | 02 /
WESSEL, Thomas A. Bahnecke 19 59558 Lippstadt / DE | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17726201.1 | 03.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017EP60569 | Priority number, date | DE201610108324 | 04.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016108324 | [2019/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017191209 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452372 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452372 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/24, B65B43/58 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B65B1/24 (EP);
B65B1/06 (EP);
B65B1/30 (EP);
B65B43/58 (EP);
B65B57/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FUELLEN VON GROSSSAECKEN | [2022/25] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING LARGE BAGS | [2019/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR REMPLIR DES SACS GRANDS | [2022/25] |
Former [2019/11] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FÜLLEN VON GROßSÄCKEN | ||
Former [2019/11] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLISSAGE DE GRANDS RÉCIPIENTS VRAC SOUPLES | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 30.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | GB | 03.05.2023 | IE | 03.05.2023 | LU | 03.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 09.11.2022 | |
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 09.11.2022 | |
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | HR | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3376905 (LAU ERWIN M) [A] 1-28* Figures 1 and 2 with the concening description *; | [IA]US2015175280 (DUDAS JEFFREY ALLEN [US], et al) [I] 1-5,7,8,16,17 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0024] - [0028] * [A] 6,9-15,18-28 | Examination | US4718464 |