EP3455375 - DETECTION OF MET EXON 14 DELETIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/12] | DETECTION OF MET EXON 14 DELETIONS AND ASSOCIATED THERAPIES | ||
[2023/26] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEUNG, Cindy 38849 Judie Way Fremont, California 94536 / US | 02 /
HILLMAN, Grantland 6753 Manor Crest Oakland, California 94618 / US | 03 /
MA, Xiaoju Max 416 Portofino Drive 201 San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 04 /
MANOHAR, Chitra 420 Ventura Place San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 05 /
WONG, Lily 1736 Trollman Avenue San Mateo, California 94401 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Hövelmann, Sascha Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPMM.....6164) Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2019/12] | Schwarz, Ralf, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung, Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17726561.8 | 11.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017EP61310 | Priority number, date | US201662336362P | 13.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662336362 P | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017194668 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455375 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3455375 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/686, C12Q1/6886 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2521/107, C12Q2537/101, C12Q2539/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON MET-EXON-14-DELETIONEN | [2023/26] | English: | DETECTION OF MET EXON 14 DELETIONS | [2023/26] | French: | DÉTECTION DE DÉLÉTIONS DE L'EXON 14 DU GÈNE MET | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/12] | NACHWEIS VON MET-EXON-14-DELETIONEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE THERAPIEN | ||
Former [2019/12] | DETECTION OF MET EXON 14 DELETIONS AND ASSOCIATED THERAPIES | ||
Former [2019/12] | DÉTECTION DE DÉLÉTIONS DE L'EXON 14 DU GÈNE MET ET TRAITEMENTS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 13.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.06.2023 | 06.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - JEEYUN LEE ET AL, "Gastrointestinal malignancies harbor actionable MET exon 14 deletions", ONCOTARGET, United States, (20150910), vol. 6, no. 29, doi:10.18632/oncotarget.4721, ISSN 1949-2553, pages 28211 - 28222, XP055389456 [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,9-30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.4721 | [I] - BENEDICT YAN ET AL, "Identification of MET genomic amplification, protein expression and alternative splice isoforms in neuroblastomas", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, GB, (20131101), vol. 66, no. 11, doi:10.1136/jclinpath-2012-201375, ISSN 0021-9746, pages 985 - 991, XP055389029 [I] 1-30 * page 986, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/jclinpath-2012-201375 | [I] - TOGASHI YOSUKE ET AL, "METgene exon 14 deletion created using the CRISPR/Cas9 system enhances cellular growth and sensitivity to a MET inhibitor", LUNG CANCER, (20151201), vol. 90, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.LUNGCAN.2015.10.020, ISSN 0169-5002, pages 590 - 597, XP029332748 [I] 1-30 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lungcan.2015.10.020 | [I] - PARK SEONGYEOL ET AL, "METamplification, protein expression, and mutations in pulmonary adenocarcinoma", LUNG CANCER, (20151201), vol. 90, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.LUNGCAN.2015.10.022, ISSN 0169-5002, pages 381 - 387, XP029332750 [I] 1-30 * abstract * * page 382, column 2, paragraphs 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lungcan.2015.10.022 | [A] - JOHNSON JASON M ET AL, "Genome-wide survey of human alternative pre-mRNA splicing with exon junction microarrays", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, (20031219), vol. 302, no. 5653, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1090100, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 2141 - 2144, XP002458857 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1090100 | [XPI] - Michael Dodge ET AL, "A NOVEL RT-ddPCR ASSAY ENABLES SENSITIVE AND ACCURATE QUANTIFICATION OF MET EXON 14 SKIPPING IN LUNG ADENOCARCINOMAS", Poster Presentation, Association for Molecular Pathology, Annual Meeting 2016, (20161101), URL: http://asuragen.com/wp-content/uploads/2016/11/METex14-RTPCR-MDodge-AMP2016.pdf, (20170710), XP055389469 [XP] 1,2,4,6,7,19,20,23,24 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,8-18,21,22,25-30 |