EP3464340 - SECRETIN RECEPTOR AGONISTS TO TREAT DISEASES OR DISORDERS OF ENERGY HOMEOSTASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstr. 21 80333 München / DE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGENSPOR, Martin Körnerstrasse 7C 85356 Freising / DE | 02 /
GABLER, Sarah-Madeleine Pöppelstrasse 8 81541 München / DE | 03 /
LI, Yongguo Mauermayrstrasse 37 85354 Freising / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
KLINGENSPOR, Martin Körnerstrasse 7C 85356 Freising / DE | ||
02 /
GABLER, Sarah-Madeleine Steinstrasse 8 81667 München / DE | |||
03 /
LI, Yongguo Mauermayrstrasse 37 85354 Freising / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17727158.2 | 23.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP62420 | Priority number, date | EP20160170863 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16170863 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202851 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464340 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/645, A61K38/00, C07K14/72, G01N33/74 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/723 (EP);
A61K38/2242 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2242, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | SEKRETINREZEPTOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN ODER STÖRUNGEN DER ENERGIEHOMÖOSTASE | [2019/15] | English: | SECRETIN RECEPTOR AGONISTS TO TREAT DISEASES OR DISORDERS OF ENERGY HOMEOSTASIS | [2019/15] | French: | AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR DE LA SÉCRÉTINE POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES OU DES TROUBLES DE L'HOMÉOSTASIE ÉNERGÉTIQUE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 24.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - SEKAR REVATHI ET AL, "Secretin receptor-knockout mice are resistant to high-fat diet-induced obesity and exhibit impaired intestinal lipid absorption", FASEB JOURNAL, (20140425), vol. 28, no. 8, doi:10.1096/fj.13-247536, pages 3494 - 3505, XP002763314 [I] 1-14 * page 3502 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.13-247536 | [I] - SEKAR REVATHI ET AL, "Lipolytic actions of secretin in mouse adipocytes", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (201402), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 190 - 200, XP002763315 [I] 1-14 * page 197 - page 199 * | [I] - CHENG CARRIE YUEN YEE ET AL, "Central and Peripheral Administration of Secretin Inhibits Food Intake in Mice through the Activation of the Melanocortin System", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (201101), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0893-133X, pages 459 - 471, XP002763316 [I] 1-14 * page 467, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 469, column r, paragraph 2 * | [X] - BEINBORN MARTIN, "Class B GPCRs: A hidden agonist within?", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (20060701), vol. 70, no. 1, doi:10.1124/mol.106.025932, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 1 - 4, XP002763317 [X] 10 * the whole document * | [X] - JEREZ A TE ET AL, "Predicting the effects of amino acid replacements in peptide hormones on their binding affinities for class B GPCRs and application to the design of secretin receptor antagonists", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20120511), vol. 26, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S10822-012-9574-X, ISSN 1573-4951, pages 835 - 845, XP035096411 [X] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10822-012-9574-x | [X] - Kailash Singh et al, "Structure-Activity Relationship Studies of N- and C-Terminally Modified Secretin Analogs for the Human Secretin Receptor", PLOS ONE, vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0149359, (20160301), Database accession no. E0149359, pages 1 - 19, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0149359, (201610), XP002763318 [X] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0149359 | [X] - DONG M ET AL, "Refinement of the pharmacophore of an agonist ligand of the secretin receptor using conformationally constrained cyclic hexapeptides", PEPTIDES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 31, no. 6, ISSN 0196-9781, (20100601), pages 1094 - 1098, (20100307), XP027046212 [X] 10 * the whole document * | [I] - R. SEKAR ET AL, "Role of Secretin Peptide Family and their Receptors in the Hypothalamic Control of Energy Homeostasis", HORMONE AND METABOLIC RESEARCH, DE, (20130925), vol. 45, no. 13, doi:10.1055/s-0033-1353155, ISSN 0018-5043, pages 945 - 954, XP055401285 [I] 1-14 * page 946 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0033-1353155 | by applicant | US4946778 | US6080560 | WO2008022759 | WO9813526 | EP2221377 | - OH, CURR TOP MED CHEM, (2009), vol. 9, pages 466 - 481 | - CAREY AL ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (201301), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 147 - 55 | - LIDELL, J INT MED, (2014), vol. 276, pages 364 - 377 | - HIMMS-HAGEN, CMA JOURNAL, (1979), vol. 121, pages 1361 - 1364 | - ROTHWELL, NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, pages 31 - 35 | - LICHTENBELT, NEJM, (2009), vol. 360, pages 1500 - 1508 | - VIRTANEN, NEJM, (2009), vol. 360, pages 1518 - 1525 | - BARTELT; HEEREN, NAT REV ENDOCRINOL, (2014), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 24 - 36 | - "Brown adipose tissue", KLINGENSPOR, M.; FROMME, T., Adipose Tissue Biology, SPRINGER, (2012), vol. 414 | - SAITO ET AL., DIABETES, (2009), vol. 58, no. 7, pages 1526 - 1531 | - VIRTANEN ET AL., NEJM, (2009), vol. 360, pages 1518 - 1525 | - CINTI, NUTR METABOL CARDIOVAS DIS, (2006), vol. 16, pages 569 - 574 | - GUNAWARDANA, DIABETES, (2012), vol. 61, pages 674 - 682 | - GUNAWARDANA, WORLD J DIABET, (2014), vol. 15, pages 420 - 430 | - ROMAN, TRANSLATIONAL RESEARCH, (2014), pages 1 - 15 | - GETHER, ENDOCRINE REVIEWS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 90 - 113 | - CHOW, BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1995), vol. 212, pages 204 - 211 | - TRIMBLE ET AL., THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1986), vol. 239, pages 257 - 261 | - TRIMBLE ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3146 - 3150 | - NEVES ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 1636 - 1639 | - OTSUKI ET AL., DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (1981), vol. 26, pages 538 - 544 | - FRIEDMAN; SNAPE, FED PROC, (1947), vol. 6, page 107 | - CHRISTODOULOPOULOS ET AL., THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1961), vol. 201, pages 1020 - 1024 | - ISENBERG ET AL., REGULATORY PEPTIDES, (1984), vol. 8, pages 315 - 320 | - JONES ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1971), vol. 60, pages 64 - 68 | - SANDERS ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 245, pages G641 - 646 | - SHIMA ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGIA JAPONICA, (1978), vol. 25, pages 461 - 465 | - AHREN; LUNDQUIST, DIABETOLOGIA, (1981), vol. 20, pages 54 - 59 | - SCHAFFALITZKY; MUCKADELL, SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND LABORATORY INVESTIGATION SUPPLEMENTUM, (2001), vol. 234, pages 105 - 108 | - KRAEGEN ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1970), vol. 49, pages 524 - 529 | - KOFOD, REGULATORY PEPTIDES, (1986), vol. 15, pages 229 - 237 | - O'DONOHUE ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1981), vol. 78, pages 5221 - 5224 | - CHARLTON ET AL., PEPTIDES, (1981), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 45 - 49 | - MUTT ET AL., LIFE SCIENCES, (1979), vol. 25, pages 1703 - 1707 | - CHU ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2009), vol. 106, pages 15961 - 15966 | - HORVATH ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR ACADEMIC MINORITY PHYSICIANS : THE OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR ACADEMIC MINORITY PHYSICIANS, (1998), vol. 9, pages 9 - 15 | - SANDLER ET AL., THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 341, pages 1801 - 1806 | - CHENG ET AL., NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2011), vol. 36, pages 459 - 471 | - BUTCHER; CARLSON, ACTA PHYSIOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA, (1970), vol. 79, pages 559 - 563 | - SEKAR; CHOW, JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (2014), vol. 55, pages 190 - 200 | - AQUILA ET AL., EMBO J, (1985), vol. 4, no. 9, pages 2369 - 2376 | - BOUILLAUD ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1986), vol. 261, no. 4, pages 1487 - 1490 | - CASSARD ET AL., J CELL BIOCHEM., (199007), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 255 - 64 | - NEDERGAARD ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (20010301), vol. 1504, no. 1, pages 82 - 106 | - SEALE P ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 454, pages 961 - 967 | - ROSENWALD ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL., (201306), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 659 - 67 | - LEE ET AL., FASEB J., (201406), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 2632 - 44 | - ZAMORE, NAT STRUCT BIOL., (2001), vol. 8, no. 9, page 746 | - TUSCHL, CHEMBIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 2, no. 4, page 239 | - WON ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2014), vol. 13, pages 1157 - 1164 | - KOLONIN ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 10, pages 625 - 632 | - NEDERGAARD J; LINDBERG O, "Norepinephrine-stimulated fatty-acid release and oxygen consumption in isolated hamster brown-fat cells. Influence of buffers, albumin, insulin and mitochondrial inhibitors", EUR J BIOCHEM, (1979), vol. 95, pages 139 - 145 | - TANAKA E ET AL., "Regulation of heat production of brown adipocytes via typical and atypical beta-adrenoceptors in the rat", JPN J PHYSIOL., (1995), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 1043 - 51 | - LEE P ET AL., "Functional thermogenic beige adipogenesis is inducible in human neck fat", INT J OBES (LOND, (201402), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 170 - 6 | - BOCKLER H ET AL., "Complete cold substitution of noradrenaline-induced thermogenesis in the Djungarian hamster", PHODOPUS SUNGORUS. EXPERIENTIA, (19820215), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 261 - 2 | - CRANE JD ET AL., "A standardized infrared imaging technique that specifically detects UCP1-mediated thermogenesis in vivo", MOL METAB., (20140421), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 490 - 4 | - OUELLET V ET AL., "Brown adipose tissue oxidative metabolism contributes to energy expenditure during acute cold exposure in humans", J CLIN INVEST, (201202), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 545 - 52 | - LI ET AL., EMBO REP, (201410), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 1069 - 76 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR, IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC, (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - SCHIER, HUMAN ANTIBODIES HYBRIDOMAS, (1996), vol. 7, pages 97 - 105 | - MALMBORG, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 183, pages 7 - 13 | - GRABULOVSKI ET AL., JBC, (2007), vol. 282, pages 3196 - 3204 | - BERTSCHINGER ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2007), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 57 - 68 | - GEBAUER; SKERRA, CURR OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 13, pages 245 - 255 | - SCHLATTER ET AL., MABS, (2012), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 1 - 12 | - TIEDE ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2014), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 145 - 55 | - FELDWISCH J; TOLMACHEV V., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2012), vol. 899, pages 103 - 26 | - WEIDLE UH ET AL., CANCER GENOMICS PROTEOMICS, (2013), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 155 - 68 | - BESTE G; SCHMIDT FS; STIBORA T; SKERRA A, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1999), vol. 96, no. 5, pages 1898 - 903 | - WEIDLE ET AL., CANCER GENOMICS PROTEOMICS, (2013), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 155 - 68 | - MOURATOU B; BEHAR G; PAILLARD-LAURANCE L; COLINET S; PECORARI F., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2012), vol. 805, pages 315 - 31 | - OSBORNE, CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 1, pages 5 - 9 | - STULL; SZOKA, PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 465 - 483 | - FOUGEROLLES ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2008), vol. 8, pages 280 - 285 | - "Delivering Small Interfering RNA for Novel Therapeutics", LU ET AL., Methods in Molecular Biology, (2008), vol. 437 | - MELANI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 2897 - 2901 | - GANGULI ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (1998), vol. 286, pages 593 - 598 | - SOLOMON ET AL., THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 276, pages G808 - 816 | - SHIRATORI ET AL., PANCREAS, (1986), vol. 1, pages 483 - 487 | - CHEY; CHANG, JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY: AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE POLISH PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, (2003), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 105 - 112 | - CHANG ET AL., PANCREAS, (1999), vol. 19, pages 401 - 405 | - CHEY; CHANG, PANCREAS, (2014), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 162 - 182 | - LI ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1990), vol. 86, pages 1474 - 1479 | - CHEY; CHANG, JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2003), vol. 38, pages 1025 - 1035 | - EBAS ET AL., PANCREAS, (1990), vol. 5, pages 555 - 558 | - SHIRATORI ET AL., PANCREAS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 323 - 328 | - SHIRATORI ET AL., DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (1989), vol. 35, pages 1140 - 1145 | - WATANABE ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1992), vol. 102, pages 621 - 628 | - LEE ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1998), vol. 114, pages 1054 - 1060 | - LI ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY GASTROINTESTINAL AND LIVER PHYSIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 280, pages G595 - 602 | - PARK ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY GASTROINTESTINAL AND LIVER PHYSIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 278, pages G557 - 562 | - DONG ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 50, pages 8181 - 8192 | - TE ET AL., J COMPUT AIDED MOL DES, (2012), vol. 26, pages 835 - 845 | - MIEGUEU ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, (2013), vol. 37, pages 366 - 374 | - KIM ET AL., THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1979), vol. 236, pages E539 - 544 | - LI Y; FROMME T; SCHWEIZER S; SCHOTTL T; KLINGENSPOR M, EMBO REP, (201410), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 1069 - 76 | - LI Y; FROMME T; KLINGENSPOR M, "Meaningful respirometric measurements of UCP1-mediated thermogenesis", BIOCHIMIE, (201703), vol. 134, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biochi.2016.12.005, pages 56 - 61, XP029935592 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biochi.2016.12.005 | US19910746121 |