EP3465156 - FLUORESCENCE LIFETIME MICROSCOPIC METHOD WITH TIME-CORRELATED SINGLE PHOTON COUNTING WHICH ALLOWS HIGHER LIGHT INTENSITIES, AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/15] | FLUORESCENCE-LIFETIME IMAGING MICROSCOPY METHOD HAVING TIME-CORRELATED SINGLE-PHOTON COUNTING, WHICH METHOD PERMITS HIGHER LIGHT INTENSITIES | ||
[2019/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH CPTD Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYFRIED, Volker Jahnstraße 28 69226 Nußloch / DE | 02 /
WIDZGOWSKI, Bernd Bahnhofstrasse 6 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
HECHT, Frank Collinistrasse 5 68161 Mannheim / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17727541.9 | 24.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP62656 | Priority number, date | DE201610109723 | 25.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016109723 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202980 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465156 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3465156 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N21/6458 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZENZLEBENSDAUER-MIKROSKOPIEVERFAHREN MIT ZEITKORRELIERTER EINZELPHOTONENZÄHLUNG WELCHES HÖHERE LICHTINTENSITÄTEN ZULÄSST, UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/35] | English: | FLUORESCENCE LIFETIME MICROSCOPIC METHOD WITH TIME-CORRELATED SINGLE PHOTON COUNTING WHICH ALLOWS HIGHER LIGHT INTENSITIES, AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE | [2019/35] | French: | MÉTHODE DE MICROSCOPIE POUR DÉTERMINER LA DURÉE DE VIE DE FLUORESCENCE BASÉ SUR LE COMPTAGE MONOPHOTONIQUE À CORRELATION TEMPORELLE QUI PERMET DES INTENSITÉS LUMINEUSES SUPÉRIEURES, ET DISPOSITF CORRESPONDANT | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/15] | FLUORESZENZLEBENSDAUER-MIKROSKOPIEVERFAHREN MIT ZEITKORRELIERTER EINZELPHOTONENZÄHLUNG WELCHES HÖHERE LICHTINTENSITÄTEN ZULÄSST | ||
Former [2019/15] | FLUORESCENCE-LIFETIME IMAGING MICROSCOPY METHOD HAVING TIME-CORRELATED SINGLE-PHOTON COUNTING, WHICH METHOD PERMITS HIGHER LIGHT INTENSITIES | ||
Former [2019/15] | PROCÉDÉ DE MICROSCOPIE À DURÉE DE VIE DE FLUORESCENCE À COMPTAGE DE PHOTONS UNIQUES CORRÉLÉ DANS LE TEMPS, LEQUEL PROCÉDÉ AUTORISE DES INTENSITÉS LUMINEUSES ÉLEVÉES | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2017 | AL | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | IE | 24.05.2020 | LU | 24.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 24.05.2017 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 24.05.2020 | ||
LU | 24.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.05.2017 | |
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 24.05.2020 | ||
LU | 24.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 24.05.2020 | ||
LU | 24.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 24.05.2020 | ||
LU | 24.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102011055330 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [AD] 1-21 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023] ** paragraphs [0029] - [0036] *; | [A] - Michael Wahl, "The Principle of Time-Correlated Single Photon Counting", PicoQuant Technical Note, (20140624), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://www.picoquant.com/images/uploads/page/files/7253/technote_tcspc.pdf, (20140819), XP055135297 [A] 1-21 * pages 1-3 * * page 5, column r, paragraph l - page 6, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 9 * | [A] - JOCHEN ARLT ET AL, "A study of pile-up in integrated time-correlated single photon counting systems", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS., US, (20131010), vol. 84, no. 10, doi:10.1063/1.4824196, ISSN 0034-6748, page 103105, XP055278177 [A] 1-21 * pages 103105-1 - pages 103105-2 * * pages 103105-7 - pages 103105-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4824196 | [A] - SEBASTIAN ISBANER ET AL, "Dead-time correction of fluorescence lifetime measurements and fluorescence lifetime imaging", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20160421), vol. 24, no. 9, doi:10.1364/OE.24.009429, pages 9429 - 9445, XP055396466 [A] 1-21 * page 9430 - page 9434 * * figure 6 * * page 9443 - page 9444 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.24.009429 | by applicant | DE4339784 | US7215421 | WO2010089363 | US7999238 | DE102011052334 | DE102011055330 | DE102011055945 | - BAJZER, Z. ET AL., "Maximum-Likelihood Method For The Analysis Of Time-Resolved Fluorescence Decay Curves", EUROPEAN BIOPHYSICS JOURNAL, (1991), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 247 - 262 |