26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
24.06.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
21.06.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.06.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.06.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.02.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.10.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2020 |
First examination report |
|
14.04.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
09.08.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
08.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
08.03.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.03.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
13.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
04.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
20.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|