Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11440155 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | B2 | US2019270173 | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP63375 | 01.06.2017 | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109641339B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2021 | B | CN109641339 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP63375 | 01.06.2017 | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025999 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP63375 | 01.06.2017 | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017272788B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2022 | B2 | AU2017272788 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP63375 | 01.06.2017 | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3463749 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2022 | B1 | EP3463749 | 10.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP63375 | 01.06.2017 | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017207723 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE540214 | 02.05.2018 | C2 | SE1650788 | 04.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1650788 | 03.06.2016 |