EP3417431 - ANTI-SHIMMING DEVICE, READER, METHOD AND KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMD Holding B.V. Schapendrift 96 1261 HS Blaricum / NL | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEDEE, Cornelis Johannes Nieuwe Schaft 9 3991 AS Houten / NL | 02 /
DE JONGH, Marina Helena Nieuwe Schaft 9 3991 AS Houten / NL | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Hoeben, Ferdinand Egon Allied Patents B.V. Postbus 1551 1200 BN Hilversum / NL | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17728280.3 | 20.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017NL50102 | Priority number, date | NL20162016283 | 18.02.2016 Original published format: NL 2016283 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017142414 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417431 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00, G07F7/08, G06K13/08 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
G07F19/2055 (EP,US);
G06K13/08 (EP,US);
G06K13/0887 (EP,US);
G06K7/0021 (EP,US);
G07F7/0873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | ANTI-SHIM-VORRICHTUNG, LESEGERÄT, VERFAHREN UND KIT | [2018/52] | English: | ANTI-SHIMMING DEVICE, READER, METHOD AND KIT | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-CALAGE, LECTEUR, PROCÉDÉ ET KIT ASSOCIÉS | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 18.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/35] | Request for further processing for: | 07.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0414390 (TECHNOPHONE LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-14 * * column 2, lines 17-39 * * column 3, lines 2-20 * * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 20 * [I] 1-26; | [A]US5872353 (REICHARDT MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract *; | [I]WO2013085391 (CARD SWIPE PROT TECHNOLOGY B V [NL], et al) [I] 1-26 * abstract * * page 19, line 18 - page 23, line 13 *; | [A]US2013299582 (OZAWA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0059] - [0074] - [0078] *; | [A]US2014054368 (LI YEDONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0029] - [0031] * |