EP3484466 - COMBINATION OF SPLEEN TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS AND OTHER THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAKE, Rachael, L. 21 Manchester Place Natick, MA 01760 / US | 02 /
SAPPAL, Jessica J. 87 Nowell Road Wakefield, MA 02148 / US | 03 /
KANNAN, Karuppiah 47 Auburn Street Newton, MA 02465 / US | 04 /
SHOU, Yaping 293 Sargent Road Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17728976.6 | 26.05.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017US34805 | Priority number, date | US201662361999P | 13.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361999 P | US201662425578P | 22.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662425578 P | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018013239 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484466 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/196, A61K31/198, A61K31/4184, A61K31/437, A61K31/513, A61K31/496, A61K31/675, A61K45/06, A61K31/454, A61K31/519, A61K39/395, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2818 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/196, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION AUS MILZ-TYROSIN-KINASE-INHIBITOREN UND ANDEREN THERAPEUTIKA | [2019/21] | English: | COMBINATION OF SPLEEN TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS AND OTHER THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2019/21] | French: | COMBINAISON D'INHIBITEURS DE LA TYROSINE KINASE DE LA RATE ET D'AUTRES AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 11.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 03.09.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/09] | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2011152273 (ARIKAWA YASUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,13,14,16,19,20,51,52 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraphs 157, 161 * * page 25, paragraph 304 * * page 26, paragraph 309 * * page 26, paragraph 315 - paragraph 316 * * page 48; example 28 * * claim 32 * [Y] 21-25,36,37 [I] 3,5,6,8,9,11,12,15,17,18,44-50,53,54; | [XYI]WO2012044936 (PORTOLA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13,14,19-21,50-52 * page 5, paragraph 15 * * page 6, paragraph 20 - page 7, paragraph 21 * * page 8, paragraph 30 * * page 9, paragraph 35 * * page 11, paragraph 64 * * page 12, paragraph 66 * * page 25, paragraph 139 * * claims 15, 17, 28, 30, 32 * [Y] 4,5,10,11,16,17,22-25,37 [I] 3,6,8,9,12,15,18,36,44-49,53,54; | [Y]WO2015138199 (VOUDOURIS VASILIOS [US]) [Y] 1-25,36,37,44-54 * claims 1-3, 78-80 *; | [Y]WO2015164330 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [Y] 1-25,36,37,44-54 * page 7, line 17 - line 22 * * page 13, line 19 - line 21 * * page 32, line 18 - line 24 * * claims 36, 43, 45 *; | [Y]US2016176869 (CHEN RONGLIANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-25,36,37,44-54 * claims 1, 14, 16, 17 *; | [XYI] - ROSSI RANDAL ET AL, "Rational Combinations Including a Novel Syk Inhibitor, Fostamatinib Disodium (FosD) in Diffuse Large B Cell Lymphoma. | Blood Journal", BLOOD, (20091101), vol. 114, no. 22, ISSN 0006-4971, XP055392850 [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15,19-21 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 2, line 7 - line 31 * * page 3, line 9 - line 12 * [Y] 4,5,10,11,16,17,22-25,37 [I] 6,12,18,36,44-54 | [XYI] - KAZUMI HAGIWARA ET AL, "Cytotoxic Effect of Bendamustine Combined with Kinase Inhibitors in Hematologic Cell Lines | Blood Journal", BLOOD, United States, (20120101), vol. 120, no. 21, ISSN 1528-0020, page 4912, XP055392669 [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15,19-21 * page 2, line 2 - line 10 * * page 2, line 26 - line 28 * [Y] 4,5,10,11,16,17,22-25,37 [I] 6,12,18,36,44-54 | [XYI] - NOELIA PURROY, "Syk Inhibition By TAK-659 Overcomes Proliferative, Survival and Migratory Signals from the Microenvironment in Chronic Lymphocytic Leukemia Cells", BLOOD, (20141206), vol. 124, no. 21, XP055304217 [X] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 5 - line 15 * * page 3, line 1 - line 4 * [Y] 4,5,13,14,16-25,36,37 [I] 5,6,45-54 | [Y] - HARRISON ANDREW M ET AL, "Rituximab for Non-Hodgkin's Lymphoma: A Story of Rapid Success in Translation", CTS-CLINICAL AND TRANSLATIONAL SCIENCE, (201402), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 82 - 86, XP002772526 [Y] 22-25,37 * abstract * * page 82, column right, line 1 - line 16 * * page 84, column left, line 26 - line 28 * * page 85, line 7 - line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/cts.12111 | by applicant | WO2011022439 | WO2011079051 | US8440689 | - TURNER et al., Immunology Today, (20000000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 148 - 154 | - SANDERSON et al., Inflammation & Allergy - Drug Targets, (20090000), vol. 8, pages 87 - 95 | - HAHN et al., Cancer Cell, (20090000), vol. 16, pages 281 - 294 | - CHU et al., Immunol. Rev, (19980000), vol. 165, pages 167 - 180 | - FELDMAN et al., Leukemia, (20080000), vol. 22, pages 1139 - 1143 | - RINALDI et al., Br. J. Haematol., (20060000), vol. 132, pages 303 - 316 | - STREUBEL et al., Leukemia, (20060000), vol. 20, pages 313 - 318 | - BUCHNER et al., Cancer Research, (20090000), vol. 69, no. 13, pages 5424 - 5432 | - BAUDOT et al., Oncogene, (20090000), vol. 28, pages 3261 - 3273 | - SINGH et al., Cancer Cell, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 489 - 500 | - BERGE et al., J. Pharm. Sci, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - CHESON et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20070000), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 579 - 586 | - OKEN et al., Am. J. Clin. Oncol., (19820000), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 649 - 655 | - COCKCROFT et al., Nephron, (19760000), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 31 - 41 | - "The Criteria Committee of New York Heart Association", Nomenclature and Criteria for Diagnosis of Diseases of the Heart and Great Vessels, Little, Brown & Co, (19940000), pages 253 - 256 | - "Drug Interaction Studies - Study Design, Data Analysis, Implications for Dosing, and Labeling Recommendations, Draft Guidance", U.S. Food and Drug Administration, URL: http://www.fda.gOv/downloads/Drugs/GuidanceComplianceRegulatoryInformation/Guidances/UCM292362.pdf | - "Drug Development and Drug Interactions", U.S. Food and Drug Administration, URL: http://www.fda.gov/Drugs/DevelopmentApprovalProcess/DevelopmentResources/%20DrugInteractionsLabeling/ucm080499.htm | - RUMMEL et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20050000), vol. 23, no. 15, pages 3383 - 3389 | - VACIRCA et al., Ann. Hematol., (20140000), vol. 93, no. 3, pages 403 - 409 | - LECHNER et al., J. Transl. Med., (20110000), vol. 9, page 90 | - COTECHINI et al., Cancer. J., (20150000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 343 - 350 | - DILILLO et al., J. Immunol., (20100000), vol. 184, no. 7, pages 4006 - 4016 | - LUGER et al., PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 10, page e76115 | - EISENHAUER et al., Eur. J. Cancer, (20090000), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 228 - 247 | - CHESON BD et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20070000), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 579 - 586 |