EP3465584 - METHOD FOR SECURING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMIA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBEROT, Francis c/o OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 COLOMBES / FR | 02 /
DE OLIVEIRA, Marco c/o OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 COLOMBES / FR | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17729524.3 | 22.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017FR51254 | Priority number, date | FR20160054572 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: FR 1654572 | [2019/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017203146 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465584 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/34 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (US);
G07F7/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD FOR SECURING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCURISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE CORRESPONDANT | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 22.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 09.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007078431 (WELCOME REAL TIME PTE LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1,13-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 22 - page 6, line 33 *; | [XI]FR2958770 (OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [X] 1,9-17 * abstract * * page 1, lines 9 -12; figure 2 * * page 12, line 7 - page 15, line 27; figure 4 * [I] 2-8; | [A]FR2984648 (OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 8, lines 10-21; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2015059389 (ORANGE [FR]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 11, lines 5-19; figure 1A *; | [A]WO2015095517 (CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] ** paragraph [0029] *; | [XI]WO2016061093 (PAYPAL INC [US]) [X] 1,9-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0043]; figure 4 * [I] 2-8 |