EP3472204 - METHOD FOR PREPARING ANTI-AMH ANTIBODIES AND USES OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomérieux 69280 Marcy-L'Etoile / FR | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATAMAN-ONAL, Yasemin 91 Chemin du Coteau 01600 Reyrieux / FR | 02 /
CHEUCLE, Sylvie 32 Rue du Jacquemet 69890 La Tour de Salvagny / FR | 03 /
COMBE, Maxime 8 Rue Victor Hugo 69002 Lyon / FR | 04 /
DANIEL, Soizic 251 Avenue du Maine 01600 Trevoux / FR | 05 /
OTTONE, Sophie 8 Montée des Ruines 69210 Sain-Bel / FR | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17731864.9 | 16.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017EP64759 | Priority number, date | EP20160175041 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: EP 16175041 | [2019/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017216334 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472204 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/26, G01N33/53 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/26 (EP,RU,US);
G01N33/53 (RU);
G01N33/689 (EP,RU,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/10 (US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ANTI-AMH-ANTIKÖRPERN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING ANTI-AMH ANTIBODIES AND USES OF SAME | [2019/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ANTICORPS ANTI-AMH ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 30.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2006127850 (BECKMAN COULTER INC [US]); | [A]WO2008153433 (STATE RES INST OF HIGHLY PURE [RU], et al); | [AD]WO2014074835 (ANSH LABS LLC [US]); | [A]WO2014204327 (OTAGO INNOVATION LTD [NZ]); | by applicant | WO9215699 | US7429487 | US7897350 | WO2014074835 |