EP3641610 - CYCLONIC SEPARATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Floor Care Technology Limited P.O. Box 957 Offshore Incorporations Centre Road Town Tortola / VG | [2021/13] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states TTI (Macao Commercial Offshore) Limited Units A-C, 26/F Centro Comercial da Praia Grande No. 429 Avenida da Praia Grande Macao / MO | ||
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states TTI (Macao Commercial Offshore) Limited Units A-C, 26/F Centro Comercial da Praia Grande No. 429 Avenida da Praia Grande Macao / MO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Pougher c/o Vax Limited 5th Floor, 2 Colmore Square 38 Colmore Circus Queensway Birmingham West Midlands B4 6BN / GB | 02 /
HOLMES, Darren c/o Vax Limited Artillery House Heritage Way Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 8YB / GB | 03 /
WATERS, Richard c/o Vax Limited Artillery House Heritage Way Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 8YB / GB | 04 /
JAANUS, Anna c/o Vax Limited Artillery House Heritage Way Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 8YB / GB | 05 /
CASELLA, Jose c/o Vax Limited Artillery House Heritage Way Droitwich, Worcestershire WR9 8YB / GB | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/11] |
Former [2020/18] | Purewal, Jagvir Singh Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 Munchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17732204.7 | 19.06.2017 | [2020/18] | WO2017GB51788 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234723 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641610 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3641610 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/24, A47L5/36, A47L9/16, A47L9/24 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A47L5/24 (EP,US);
B04C5/081 (US);
A47L5/36 (EP);
A47L9/1633 (EP,US);
A47L9/165 (EP,US);
A47L9/1658 (EP,US);
A47L9/1683 (EP,US);
A47L9/242 (EP,US);
B04C5/103 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYKLONABSCHEIDER | [2020/18] | English: | CYCLONIC SEPARATOR DEVICE | [2020/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF SÉPARATEUR CYCLONIQUE | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IE | 19.06.2023 | LU | 19.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IE | 19.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IE | 19.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2009073888 (HEALTHY GAIN INVEST LTD, et al) [X] 27-56 * paragraphs [0025] - [0035]; figure 2 * [A] 1-26; | [XA]GB2481608 (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 27-56 * figures 3-6 * [A] 1-16; | [XA]EP2581018 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 27-56 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0058] - [0064] - [0095] - [0098]; figures 2,3,9A,9B,9C,9D,9F *[A] 1-26; | [XA]US2013160233 (PEACE MICHAEL JAMES [GB], et al) [X] 27-56 * paragraph [0041]; figure 3 * [A] 1-26 |