Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11065677 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2020316675 | 08.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716303628 | 18.05.2017 | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102288550B | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | B1 | KR20190009802 | 29.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6982003B | Global Dossier | 17.12.2021 | B2 | JP2019516557 | 20.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109562441B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B | CN109562441 | 02.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3458208 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP3458208 | 27.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018073770 | 26.02.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018014240 | 04.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2018144986 | 22.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201807824 | 27.05.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017IB00673 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017199091 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR108536 | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662339798 | 20.05.2016 |