EP3464611 - IN SITU DETECTION OF MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fungialert Limited Rothamsted Centre for Research&Enterprise Daniel Hall Building Office 224 Rothamsted Research Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE MANZANOS GUINOT, Angela c/o FungiAlert Ltd Rothamsted Centre for Research&Enterprise Daniel Hall Building Office 224 Rothamsted Research Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | 02 /
WEAVER, Kerry O'Donnelly c/o FungiAlert Ltd Rothamsted Centre for Research&Enterprise Daniel Hall Building Office 224 Rothamsted Research Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 17732323.5 | 02.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP63450 | Priority number, date | GB20160009671 | 02.06.2016 Original published format: GB 201609671 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017207756 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464611 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,GB,IL,US);
C12Q1/24 (GB,IL,US);
C12M1/12 (GB,IL);
C12M1/123 (GB,IL);
C12M1/18 (GB,IL);
G01N2333/37 (EP,GB,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | IN-SITU-NACHWEIS VON MIKROORGANISMEN | [2019/15] | English: | IN SITU DETECTION OF MICROORGANISMS | [2019/15] | French: | DÉTECTION IN SITU DE MICRO-ORGANISMES | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO9408042 (UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al) [X] 1-5,7-19,21,28-30,38-40,42-49,51-53,55 * page 2, lines 21-23 * * page 4, lines 19-27 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 2 * [Y] 6,41 [I] 20,22-27,31-37,50,54,56-59; | [XYI]WO2011139263 (NEOGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-13,15-19,21,24,25,27-29,35,36,38-40,42-44,47,49-53,55,58,59 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0040] * [Y] 6,41 [I] 5,8,9,14,20,22,23,26,30-34,37,45,46,48,54,56,57; | [XDP]WO2016097726 (FUNGIALERT LTD [GB]) [XDP] 1-5,7-22,24,25,28-33,35-40,42-56,58,59 * Summary of Invention; page 3 * * figures 1-4 * * page 44, lines 1-21 * * claims 1-33 *; | [Y] - BRIAN REID ET AL, "Calcium-Dependent, Genus-Specific, Autoaggregation of Zoospores of Phytopathogenic Fungi", EXPERIMENTAL MYCOLOGY., GB, (19950930), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0147-5975, pages 202 - 213, XP055394264 [Y] 6,41 * first full paragraph; page 203, paragraph left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/emyc.1995.1025 |