EP3472894 - DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS HOTSPOT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/17] | DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS HOTSPOT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POINTING A DIRECTIONAL ANTENNA | ||
[2023/22] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MiWire ApS Ndr. Strandvej 119 C2 3150 Hellebaek / DK | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEISCHER, David Sveasvej 5 3150 Hellebæk / DK | 02 /
JØRGSHOLM, Michael Hestemøllestræde 6 1. sal 3000 Helsingør / DK | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17732384.7 | 20.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017EP65043 | Priority number, date | DK20160070445 | 21.06.2016 Original published format: DK 201670445 | DK20160070949 | 30.11.2016 Original published format: DK 201670949 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017220549 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472894 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3472894 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/12, H04W88/04, H01Q1/12, H01Q1/22, H01Q3/02, H01Q3/04, H01Q13/08, H01Q1/42, // H01Q5/40, H01Q21/28 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2291 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/42 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/125 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q13/085 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q3/02 (EP,US);
H01Q3/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q5/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | H01Q1/12, H01Q1/22, H01Q3/02, H04W84/12, H04W88/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIREKTIONALE DRAHTLOSE HOTSPOT-VORRICHTUNG | [2023/22] | English: | DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS HOTSPOT DEVICE | [2023/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POINT D'ACCÈS SANS FIL DIRECTIONNEL | [2023/22] |
Former [2019/17] | DIREKTIONALE DRAHTLOSE HOTSPOT-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSRICHTUNG EINER RICHTANTENNE | ||
Former [2019/17] | DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS HOTSPOT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POINTING A DIRECTIONAL ANTENNA | ||
Former [2019/17] | DISPOSITIF DE POINT D'ACCÈS SANS FIL DIRECTIONNEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE POINTAGE D'UNE ANTENNE DIRECTIONNELLE | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 21.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2021 | 30.06.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 17.01.2024 | |
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 17.01.2024 | |
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 17.04.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US6016120 (MCNABB LEA ANN [US], et al) [I] 17-19 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 30 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 11; figure 2 * [Y] 1-16,20; | [Y]US2015155904 (INGALLS MARK W [US]) [Y] 1-16,20 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figure 6 * * claim 1 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "MiFi - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20150216), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=MiFi&oldid=647385095, (20160506), XP055270934 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |