EP3481894 - BUTENE-1 POLYMER COMPOSITION HAVING A HIGH MELT FLOW RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pontaccio 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHINI, Roberta c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
SPATARO, Stefano c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
BURGIN, Emanuele c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 04 /
PICA, Roberta c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | LyondellBasell c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia Intellectual Property P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 17733861.3 | 03.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP66424 | Priority number, date | EP20160178432 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16178432 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018007280 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481894 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/20, C08F2/00, C09J123/20 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C09J123/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/08 (KR,US);
C08F10/08 (US);
C08F2/001 (US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F210/16 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/65916 (KR);
C08F4/65927 (KR,US);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
C08F2500/17 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/08, C08F2/001 (EP);
C08F210/08, C08F210/16, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/12 (EP);
C08F210/08, C08F4/65927 (EP);
C08L23/20, C08L23/20 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | BUTEN-1-POLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHER SCHMELZFLUSSRATE | [2019/20] | English: | BUTENE-1 POLYMER COMPOSITION HAVING A HIGH MELT FLOW RATE | [2019/20] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE DE BUTÈNE-1 À INDICE DE FLUIDITÉ ÉLEVÉ | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/37] | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]EP0314495 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [ID] 1-11 * claim 1 * * tables 1,2 * * page 1, line 10 - line 19 * * page 2, line 1 - line 2 *; | [AD]EP1477499 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-11 * claim 12 * * tables 1,2 *; | [A]WO2012052429 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 ** tables 1-3 *; | [A]EP2915858 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * claim 5 * * examples 1-5; table 2 * | by applicant | EP0314495 | US4833192 | EP0331410 | WO0147939 | EP1477499 | WO2004099269 | WO2006045687 | WO2009000637 | WO2015074830 | - Journal of Polymer Science Part B: Polymer Letters Volume 1, (19631100), vol. 11, pages 587 - 591 | - Macromolecules, (20020000), vol. 35, no. 7 | - C. J. CARMAN; R. A. HARRINGTON; C. E. WILKES, Macromolecules, (19770000), vol. 10, no. 3, page 536 | - M. KAKUGO; Y. NAITO, K. MIZUNUMA; T. MIYATAKE, Macromolecules, (19820000), vol. 16, no. 4, page 1160 | - J. C. RANDALL, Macromol. Chem Phys., (19890000), vol. C30, page 211 |