EP3474688 - FOOD PRINTER WITH MOVEMENT COORDINATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERBE, Sebastian Maulbronner Str. 32 DE 75438 Knittlingen-Freudenstein / DE | 02 /
GÜL, Ugur Dogan Narcicegi Sok. No:11 Fulya Sisli 34394 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
SCHUSTER, Lucia Augustenstrasse 114 DE 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
SUAREZ IRIBARNE, Alvaro General Mitre 165, Ático ES 08002 Barcelona / ES | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17733983.5 | 08.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017EP63970 | Priority number, date | DE201610211157 | 22.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016211157 | [2019/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017220334 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474688 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3474688 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23P30/20, A23P20/20 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A23P30/20 (EP,US);
A23P20/20 (EP);
A23P20/25 (US);
A23P30/30 (US);
A47J44/00 (US);
A23P2020/253 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | A23P30/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELDRUCKER MIT BEWEGUNGSKOORDINATEN | [2019/18] | English: | FOOD PRINTER WITH MOVEMENT COORDINATES | [2019/18] | French: | IMPRIMANTE DE DENREES ALIMENTAIRES AVEC COORDONNÉES DE DÉPLACEMENT | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/18] | IMPRIMANTE ALIMENTAIRE À COORDONNÉES DE DÉPLACEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 22.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4670271 (PASTERNAK ELIEZER [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, line 23 - column 8, line 4; figures 2,5, * * column 12, line 38 - line 62 *; | [Y]EP2364593 (VINK JR DEV B V J [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0042]; figure 3; claim 13 *; | [Y]WO2012103005 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 31; figures 1,7,9-11; claims 1,6,21 *; | [A]US2012328747 (LEVY DAVID [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] ** paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] *; | [Y]US2016009029 (COHEN ADAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0131]; figures 12a-12d; claims 14-16 * |