EP3642032 - MULTILAYER STRETCH FILM AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apeldoorn Flexible Packaging B.V. Laan van Westenenk 11 7336 AZ Apeldoorn / NL | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUIT, Marnix Elmar Gangboord 32 3823 TH Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
ACHTEREEKTE, Frank Reinerus Johannes Klein Wielens 55 7433 EB Schalkhaar / NL | 03 /
SCHUTTERT, Mathijs Reigerstraat 64 7731 ZT Ommen / NL | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 17734662.4 | 19.06.2017 | [2020/18] | WO2017EP64966 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018233807 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642032 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B29C47/06, B29C47/56, B29C47/00, B29C55/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/18 (US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/495 (EP,US);
B29C55/00 (EP);
B32B27/327 (EP);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2250/42 (EP);
B32B2274/00 (EP);
B32B2307/51 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/581 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE DEHNFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/18] | English: | MULTILAYER STRETCH FILM AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2020/18] | French: | FILM ÉTIRABLE MULTICOUCHE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 20.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5976682 (EICHBAUER GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-35 * claim - *; | [XI]WO0149487 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,26 * page 3, line 6 - line 13 * * page 4, line 19 - line 22 * * page 5, line 8 - line 15 * * page 9, line 5 - line 15 * * claim - * [I] 2-25,27-35; | [A]US6265055 (SIMPSON DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * claim - *; | [A]WO2004060672 (TORAY PLASTICS AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-35 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2009087648 (LEE MARK S [US]) [A] 1-35* claim - *; | [XI]US2013095338 (LU PANG-CHIA [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7,26 * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] , [0027] , [0044] , [0057] , [0062] , [0063] , [0065]; claim - * [I] 2,3,5,8-25,27-35; | [A]WO2013081742 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-35 * example -; claim - * |