11.09.2024 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.06.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2021 |
First examination report |
|
30.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
02.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
21.08.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
27.03.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
27.03.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.03.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
02.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
20.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|