EP3485538 - CONNECTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stäubli Electrical Connectors AG Stockbrunnenrain 8 4123 Allschwil / CH | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASTROVITO, Andrea Im Steinacker 15 4142 Münchenstein / CH | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17734766.3 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017EP66934 | Priority number, date | EP20160179977 | 18.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16179977 | [2019/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018015170 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3485538 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/187, H01R4/48, H01R13/11, H01R25/16 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H01R13/187 (EP,KR,US);
H01R25/162 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/113 (EP,KR,US);
H01R4/4881 (EP,KR,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT | [2019/21] | English: | CONNECTING ELEMENT | [2019/21] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONNEXION | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 19.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0520950 (SOTAX AG [CH]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [IA]CH702863 (MULTI HOLDING AG [CH]) [I] 1-5,8,11,13-16 * paragraphs [0018] - [0050]; figures 1-5 * [A] 6,7,9,10,12; | [A]JP2013008629 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]WO2014146905 (MULTI HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |