EP3562917 - BLOCK PROCESSING FOR BASE STOCK PRODUCTION FROM DEASPHALTED OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRUCHEY, Kendall, S. 13422 Beall Woods 77346, Humble TX / US | 02 /
CARROLL, Michael, B. 4870 Hycliff Chase Center Valley PA 18034 / US | 03 /
HILBERT, Timothy, L. 130 North Jay Street Middleburg VA 20117 / US | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17734957.8 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017US39006 | Priority number, date | US201662439943P | 29.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662439943 P | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018125281 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562917 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10G65/00, C10G67/00, C10G67/04 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
C10G65/12 (EP,US);
C10G65/10 (KR);
B01D3/10 (US);
B01D3/14 (US);
B01J23/74 (US);
B01L3/10 (US);
C10C3/06 (KR,US);
C10C3/08 (KR,US);
C10G1/086 (EP,KR,US);
C10G21/14 (EP,KR,US);
C10G45/38 (EP,KR,US);
C10G65/00 (EP,KR,US);
C10G67/00 (EP,KR,US);
C10G67/0454 (EP,KR,US);
C10M101/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10M171/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10M175/0033 (KR,US);
B01D3/16 (US);
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C10G2300/10 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2300/1062 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2300/1077 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2400/08 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2400/10 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2201/06 (US);
C10M2201/062 (KR,US);
C10M2203/1006 (KR,US);
C10M2203/1065 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/10 (KR,US);
C10N2020/011 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2020/017 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/02 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | BLOCKVERARBEITUNG FÜR GRUNDSTOFFPRODUKTION AUS ENTASPHALTIERTEM ÖL | [2019/45] | English: | BLOCK PROCESSING FOR BASE STOCK PRODUCTION FROM DEASPHALTED OIL | [2019/45] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE BLOC POUR LA PRODUCTION D'HUILE DE BASE À PARTIR D'HUILE DÉSASPHALTÉE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 12.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]KR20030073026 (SK CORP [KR]); | [XI]US2007175794 (DUININCK JAKOB W [FR], et al) | by applicant | US3414506 | US7776206 | US9418828 |