Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3479578

Designated contracting statesALLapse: 02.09.2020
 ATLapse: 02.09.2020
 BE 
 BGLapse: 02.12.2020
 CH 
CYLapse: 02.09.2020
 CZLapse: 02.09.2020
 DE 
 DKLapse: 02.09.2020
 EELapse: 02.09.2020
 ESLapse: 02.09.2020
 FILapse: 02.09.2020
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 03.12.2020
 HRLapse: 02.09.2020
 HULapse: 22.06.2017
 IE 
 ISLapse: 02.01.2021
 ITLapse: 02.09.2020
 LI 
 LTLapse: 02.09.2020
 LU 
 LVLapse: 02.09.2020
 MCLapse: 02.09.2020
 MKLapse: 02.09.2020
 MTLapse: 02.09.2020
 NLLapse: 23.09.2020
 NOLapse: 02.12.2020
 PLLapse: 02.09.2020
 PTLapse: 04.01.2021
 ROLapse: 02.09.2020
 RSLapse: 02.09.2020
 SELapse: 02.09.2020
 SILapse: 02.09.2020
 SKLapse: 02.09.2020
 SMLapse: 02.09.2020
 TR 
Validation states MA 
 MD 
Examination procedure28.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase28.12.2018National basic fee paid 
28.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted02.09.2020
Opposition procedure03.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.08.2021 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:08.05.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:08.05.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:08.05.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20181228
 
Event date:09.10.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:30.10.2019 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20190930
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04H 60/56 20080101ALI20200210BHEP
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 21/231 20110101ALI20200210BHEP
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 16/40 20190101ALI20200210BHEP
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 21/45 20110101AFI20200210BHEP
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04H 20/38 20080101ALI20200210BHEP
 
Event date:18.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 5/761 20060101ALI20200210BHEP
 
Event date:25.03.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20200224
 
Event date:12.08.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED)
 
Event date:10.02.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 602017022813 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04N0021231000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N0021450000
 
Event date:09.10.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:02.09.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20200728
 
Event date:02.09.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:02.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1310203 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20200915
 
Event date:15.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:24.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602017022813 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:30.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:23.02.2020 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:07.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1
 
Event date:28.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION RELATED TO INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR71
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:28.07.2020 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:25.01.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201202
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201203
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201202
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:15.02.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 1310203 AT T
Code Expl.:-DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT)
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:10.02.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:28.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:07.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:23.02.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:25.09.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:05.04.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:06.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:14.07.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:05.04.2019 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210104
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210102
 
Event date:30.06.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:09.07.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:03.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602017022813 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:11.08.2021 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20210603
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:09.07.2021 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:23.02.2022 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20210622
 
Event date:09.03.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:04.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210622
 
Event date:29.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:29.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210622
 
Event date:29.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210622
 
Event date:29.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:29.07.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:28.06.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230524
 
Event date:30.06.2023 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:30.06.2023 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200923
 
Event date:31.07.2023 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20170622
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902
 
Event date:10.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240627
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:09.09.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602017022813 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:ADEIA GUIDES INC. (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELAWARE, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ROVI GUIDES, INC., SAN JOSE, CALIF., US
 
Event date:18.09.2024 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) CHANGED
Free Format Text:CASE NUMBER: APP_46199/2024
Effective DATE:20240809
 
Event date:30.09.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200902