21.08.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.01.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2022 |
First examination report |
|
04.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
23.08.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
03.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.03.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
27.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
15.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|