EP3455387 - PROTECTIVE COATING FOR A THERMALLY STRESSED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | For all designated states Oerlikon Surface Solutions AG, Pfäffikon Churerstrasse 120 8808 Pfäffikon / CH | [2023/16] |
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Oerlikon Surface Solutions AG, Pfäffikon Churerstrasse 120 8808 Pfäffikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMM, Jürgen Mühlebündtestr. 12 7304 Maienfeld / CH | 02 /
STAMM, Werner Kahlenberg 18 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17737732.2 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017EP65493 | Priority number, date | DE201610212874 | 14.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016212874 | [2019/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018010936 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455387 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C23C14/00, C23C14/32, C23C28/00 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
C23C14/081 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,KR,RU);
C23C14/0021 (EP,KR);
C23C14/14 (US);
C23C14/24 (RU);
C23C14/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/3414 (US);
C23C28/321 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,KR);
C23C28/345 (EP,KR);
C23C28/3455 (EP,KR);
C23C28/36 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | SCHUTZBESCHICHTUNG FÜR EINE THERMISCH BEANSPRUCHTE STRUKTUR | [2019/12] | English: | PROTECTIVE COATING FOR A THERMALLY STRESSED STRUCTURE | [2019/12] | French: | REVÊMENT PROTECTEUR D'UNE STRUCTURE SOUSMISE À UNE SOLLICITATION THERMIQUE | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 13.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008043606 (OERLIKON TRADING TRUEBBACH [CH], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 14, line 5 - line 6 * * page 20, line 23 - page 21, line 18; figures 4-7 * * page 16, line 19 - page 18, line 19 * [Y] 1-12; | [X]DE102008026358 (WALTER AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0025] * * claim 8 *; | [Y] - AMARENDRA K. RAI ET AL, "CMAS-Resistant Thermal Barrier Coatings (TBC)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF APPLIED CERAMIC TECHNOLOGY, (20100901), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1744-7402.2009.02373.x, ISSN 1546-542X, pages 662 - 674, XP055023168 [Y] 1-12 * page 662, column left - page 664, column left, paragraph 1 * * page 670, column left, paragraph 1 * * page 673, column right, line letze - page 674, column left, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1744-7402.2009.02373.x | [X] - NIANQIANG WU ET AL, "Hot Corrosion Mechanism of Composite Alumina/Yttria-Stabilized Zirconia Coating in Molten Sulfate-Vanadate Salt", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY., US, (20050301), vol. 88, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1551-2916.2005.00120.x, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 675 - 682, XP055410290 [X] 10-12 * page 675, column left, paragraph 2 * * page 676, column right; figure 2C * * Conclusion (4); page 682 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1551-2916.2005.00120.x |