EP3403340 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING UNIFIED WIRELESS BACKHAUL AND ACCESS NETWORK IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Boon Loong 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
RAMAKRISHNA, Sudhir 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
GUO, Li 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
NOVLAN, Thomas David 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
NAM, Young-Han 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 06 /
RAJAGOPAL, Sridhar 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Jianzhong 665 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17738606.7 | 09.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017KR00276 | Priority number, date | US201662278594P | 14.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662278594 P | US201662334001P | 10.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662334001 P | US201615335346 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: US201615335346 | KR20170001977 | 05.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170001977 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017122977 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403340 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H04B7/155 (EP,US);
H04B7/15542 (KR);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04B7/15507 (KR);
H04B7/15528 (EP,US);
H04B7/2606 (KR);
H04B7/2643 (KR);
H04L1/00 (US);
H04L27/26 (US);
H04L5/0032 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L5/0082 (EP,US);
H04L5/0092 (EP,US);
H04L5/143 (EP,US);
H04L5/16 (EP,US);
H04W40/22 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | H04B7/155, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES VEREINHEITLICHTEN DRAHTLOSEN BACKHAUL- UND ZUGANGSNETZWERKS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/47] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING UNIFIED WIRELESS BACKHAUL AND ACCESS NETWORK IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2018/47] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE LIAISON TERRESTRE SANS FIL UNIFIÉE ET UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010080139 (PALANKI RAVI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 95] - [0096] - [ 139] , [ 141]; figures 1,11, 23 * [A] 6,13 [I] 9; | [XAI]US2011299614 (KIM HAK SEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0121] , [0129] , [0133]; figures 1,11,23,28,30,31,39 * [A] 6,13 [I] 2-5,7,9-12,14; | [X] - SAMSUNG, "Access uplink subframe timing alignment", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-100136 ACCESS UL SUBFRAME TIMING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100112), vol. RAN WG1, no. Valencia, Spain; 20100118, XP050417861 [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003]; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US2014269594 (JANG JIWOONG [KR], et al) [Y] 3, 7, 10, 14 * See paragraphs [0067], [0127]-[0132], [0155]-[0157]; and figure 12. *; | [A]KR20140064858 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0062]-[0069]; and figures 2-3a. *; | [A]US2013272188 (SEO HAN-BYUL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0065]-[0078], [0086]-[0091]; and figures 3, 8A-9B. *; | [A]US2013010676 (KIM HAK SEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0059]-[0079], [0090]-[0091]; and figures 7, 13. * | [XYA] - YIFEI YUAN, "LTE-Advanced Relay Technology and Standardization", Signals and Communication Technology, ISBN 978-3-642-29675-8, (20120700), URL: http://link.springer.com/book/10.1007/978-3-642-29676-5, XP055398755 [X] 1-2, 5, 8-9, 12, 15 * See pages 6, 45-73, 92-149, 161; and figures 4.1-4.4, 4.28. * [Y] 3, 7, 10, 14 [A] 4, 6, 11, 13 |