EP3404962 - METHOD BY WHICH PGW PROCESSES DATA FOR UE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Laeyoung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jaehyun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
YOUN, Myungjune IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Dongsoo IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/47] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17738705.7 | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017KR00536 | Priority number, date | US201662278451P | 14.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662278451 P | [2018/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123076 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3404962 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3404962 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, H04W36/02, H04W36/12, H04W88/16 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US);
H04W36/02 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | H04W36/02, H04W36/12, H04W88/16 | ||
Former IPC [2018/47] | H04W36/02, H04W36/12, H04W76/04, H04W88/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, DURCH DAS PGW DATEN FÜR EIN BENUTZERGERÄT IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM VERARBEITET, UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/47] | English: | METHOD BY WHICH PGW PROCESSES DATA FOR UE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2018/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PAR LEQUEL UNE PGW TRAITE DES DONNÉES POUR UN UE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2018 | Translation filed | 14.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 11.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2017 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | GB | 16.01.2022 | IE | 16.01.2022 | LU | 16.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | FR | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
TR | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
GB | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2011310868 (YANG YONG [SE], et al) [I] 1,4-6,9-12 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * [A] 3,7,8 [Y] 2; | [A]US2014044051 (KAMALARAJ VINOD K [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [A]US2014126448 (PUNZ GOTTFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0102] * * figures 3C, 5B *; | [A]US2015036595 (JIN WEISHENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0212] *; | [Y]US2015110121 (TAN SHIYONG [CN], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0216] *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) enhancements for Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN) access (Release 13)", (20151215), 3GPP DRAFT; 23401-D50, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/Rel-13/, (20151215), XP051071877 [A] 1-12 * Section 5.3.4.3 * | International search | [A]KR20130090831 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* See paragraphs [0054]-[0068]; and figures 7-8. *; | [YA]US2014044051 (KAMALARAJ VINOD K [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 10-12 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0026], [0030], [0035]; claims 1, 6; and figure 2. * [A] 4, 7-9; | [A]WO2014173225 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-12 * See claim 1; and figure 2. *; | [Y]US2015036595 (JIN WEISHENG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 10-12 * See paragraphs [0003], [0005]-[0006], [0015], [0086], and figure 4. *; | [Y]EP2843885 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 2 * See paragraph [0008]; and claim I. * |