EP3384650 - WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION BASED ON DISCRETE COSINE TRANSFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower, 19tr Farogatan 33 16451 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states ZTE (TX) Inc. 7000 North Mopac Expressway 2nd Floor, Suite 2105 Austin, TX 78731 / US | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Aijun c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | 02 /
ZAFAR, Adnan c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | 03 /
HE, Chang c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | 04 /
XIAO, Pei c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | 05 /
IMRAN, Muhammad c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | 06 /
GAO, Yonghong c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | 07 /
JOHANSSON, Jan c/o ZTE Wistron Telecom AB Kista Science Tower Farogatan 33, 19tr. S-164 51 Kista / SE | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 17738754.5 | 05.01.2017 | [2018/41] | WO2017US12376 | Priority number, date | US201662275162P | 05.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662275162 P | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123455 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384650 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L27/34, H04L25/03 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H04L27/2639 (EP,US);
H04L25/03012 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
H04L27/2605 (US);
H04L27/2647 (US);
H04L27/26532 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | H04L27/26, H04L27/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSDATENKOMMUNIKATION AUF DER GRUNDLAGE VON DISKRETER COSINUSTRANSFORMATION | [2018/41] | English: | WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION BASED ON DISCRETE COSINE TRANSFORMATION | [2018/41] | French: | COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES SANS FIL BASÉE SUR UNE TRANSFORMATION EN COSINUS DISCRÈTE | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 04.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - DARSENA D ET AL, "Widely Linear Equalization and Blind Channel Identification for Interference-Contaminated Multicarrier Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050301), vol. 53, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TSP.2004.842198, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 1163 - 1177, XP011127122 [Y] 1-15 * Sections I. to IV. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2004.842198 | [Y] - FEIFEI GAO ET AL, "Maximum likelihood based estimation of frequency and phase offset in DCT OFDM systems under non-circular transmissions: algorithms, analysis and comparisons", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ. USA, (20080901), vol. 56, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TCOMM.2008.060411, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 1425 - 1429, XP011234360 [Y] 1-15 * Sections I., II. and III. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.2008.060411 | [I] - AL-DHAHIR N ET AL, "A new multicarrier transceiver based on the discrete cosine transform", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2005 IEEE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 13-17 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050313), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/WCNC.2005.1424474, ISBN 978-0-7803-8966-3, pages 45 - 50, XP010791153 [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * * Sections I., II. and III. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2005.1424474 | [Y] - MATTERA D ET AL, "Widely linear MMSE equalizer for MIMO linear time-dispersive channel", IMAGE AND SIGNAL PROCESSING AND ANALYSIS, 2003. ISPA 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ROME, ITALY SEPT. 18-20, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, ZAGREB, CROATIA, (20030918), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ISPA.2003.1296501, ISBN 978-953-184-061-3, pages 1176 - 1180, XP010703660 [Y] 1-15 * Sections 1. to 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPA.2003.1296501 | [T] - Adnan Zafar ET AL, "Receiver Design for DCT based Multicarrier signals", (20160127), URL: https://docbox.etsi.org/Workshop/2016/201601_FUTURERADIOTECHNOL_WORKSHOP/Ses_POSTERS_PRES/RECEIVE_DESIGN_DCT_CHANG-HE-UNIV_SURREY.pdf, (20181114), XP055523710 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - Adnan Zafar ET AL, "Receiver Design for DCT Based Multicarrier Signals", (20160913), URL: https://docbox.etsi.org/Workshop/2016/201601_FUTURERADIOTECHNOL_WORKSHOP/Ses_POSTERS_PRES/RECEIVER_DESIGN_DCT_paper.pdf, (20181114), XP055523717 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2009274220 (YUN YOUNG WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0067]-[0252]; and figures 1-46. *; | [Y]US2012320956 (SORRENTINO STEFANO [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0003], [0051], [0071] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013170568 (PRIHED ASSAF [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0027]; and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2014241412 (KALBASI REZA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0158]; and figures 1-11. *; | [Y]WO2015101445 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0028], [0033], [0036]-[0038]; and figures 1, 3. * | by applicant | - DARSENA D et al., "Widely Linear Equalization and Blind Channel Identification for Interference-Contaminated Multicarrier Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (20050301), vol. 53, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TSP.2004.842198, pages 1163 - 1177, XP011127122 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2004.842198 | - FEIFEI GAO et al., "Maximum likelihood based estimation of frequency and phase offset in DCT OFDM systems under non-circular transmissions: algorithms, analysis and comparisons", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, (20080901), vol. 56, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/TCOMM.2008.060411, pages 1425 - 1429, XP011234360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.2008.060411 | - AL-DHAHIR N et al., "WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2005 IEEE NEW ORLEANS", A new multicarrier transceiver based on the discrete cosine transform, (20050313), vol. 1, pages 45 - 50 |