EP3403122 - FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ASSEMBLIES WITH ADJUSTABLE POLARITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senko Advanced Components Inc. 2 Cabot Road, Suite 103 Hudson, MA 01749 / US | [2022/36] |
Former [2018/47] | For all designated states Senko Advanced Components Inc. 450 Donald Lynch Blvd Unit D Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Jimmy Jun-Fu 52 Upland Street Worcester Massachusetts 01607 / US | 02 /
TAKANO, Kazuyoshi 11 Fiddle Neck Lane Southborough Massachusetts 01772 / US | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17738985.5 | 13.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017US13286 | Priority number, date | US201614997375 | 15.01.2016 Original published format: US201614997375 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123831 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403122 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3403122 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/36, G02B6/38 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
G02B6/3831 (EP,US);
G02B6/3825 (US);
G02B6/3857 (US);
G02B6/3879 (EP,US);
G02B6/3885 (US);
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
G02B6/3821 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | G02B6/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHE VERBINDERANORDNUNGEN MIT EINSTELLBARER POLARITÄT | [2018/47] | English: | FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ASSEMBLIES WITH ADJUSTABLE POLARITY | [2018/47] | French: | ENSEMBLES CONNECTEUR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES À POLARITÉ RÉGLABLE | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23198271.1 / EP4300152 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8727638 (LEE JHIH-PING [TW], et al) | International search | [X]US8727638 (LEE JHIH-PING [TW], et al) | Examination | US2012308183 |