EP3402521 - INHIBITION OF ALLERGIC REACTION USING AN IL-33 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AnaptysBio, Inc. 10421 Pacific Center Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONDEI, Marco 6417 La Jolla Scenic Drive La Jolla California 92037 / US | [2018/50] |
Former [2018/47] | 01 /
LONDEI, Marco 8875 Costa Verde Boulevard 702 San Diego California 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17739165.3 | 17.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017US13818 | Priority number, date | US201662278671P | 14.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662278671 P | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017124110 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402521 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P37/08, C07K16/24, C12N15/13 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (KR);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
C07K2317/94 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | HEMMUNG VON ALLERGISCHER REAKTION UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES IL-33-INHIBITORS | [2018/47] | English: | INHIBITION OF ALLERGIC REACTION USING AN IL-33 INHIBITOR | [2018/47] | French: | INHIBITION DE RÉACTION ALLERGIQUE À L'AIDE D'UN INHIBITEUR D'IL-33 | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 18.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2015106080 (ANAPTYSBIO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067] , [0073]; examples 1-5; claims 1,26,27,33; sequences 1-231 *; | [X]KR101567758B (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST) [X] 1-4,11,15 * abstract *; | [X] - LIU X ET AL, "Anti-IL-33 antibody treatment inhibits airway inflammation in a murine model of allergic asthma", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 386, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2009.06.008, ISSN 0006-291X, (20090814), pages 181 - 185, (20090607), XP026467441 [X] 1,3,11,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.06.008 | [A] - Chu Et Al, "IL -33, but not thymic stromal lymphopoietin or IL -25, is central to mite and peanut allergic sensitization", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20130101), pages 187 - 200, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0091674912012833?via%3Dihub, (20160511), XP055271778 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO2015106080 (ANAPTYSBIO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US2014004107 (SMITH DIRK E [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US2012207752 (CHACKERIAN ALISSA A [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US2010260705 (MARTIN SEAMUS J [IE]) [A] 1-6, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US2014271658 (MURPHY ANDREW J [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 23 * entire document * |