EP3406439 - REFRACTORY MULTILAYER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Akira c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-3-17 Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8450 / JP | 02 /
SHIMAMOTO, Michio c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535 Kurohama Hasuda-shi Saitama 349-0198 / JP | 03 /
YANO, Hideaki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 3535 Kurohama Hasuda-shi Saitama 349-0198 / JP | [2022/13] |
Former [2018/48] | 01 /
UEDA, Akira c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-3-17 Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8450 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMAMOTO, Michio c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 3535 Kurohama Hasuda-shi Saitama 349-0198 / JP | |||
03 /
YANO, Hideaki c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 3535 Kurohama Hasuda-shi Saitama 349-0198 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17741536.1 | 20.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017JP01939 | Priority number, date | JP20160009514 | 21.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016009514 | [2018/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017126659 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406439 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3406439 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, E04B1/94, B32B5/02, B32B27/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/18, B32B27/10, B32B21/08, B32B15/08 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B32B27/00 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR);
B32B15/08 (EP);
B32B21/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/205 (KR);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/32 (KR);
B32B27/38 (KR);
B32B5/022 (EP,KR);
E04B1/94 (EP,KR);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2255/06 (EP);
B32B2255/08 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/12 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/48] | B32B27/00, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, E04B1/94 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERFESTE MEHRSCHICHTFOLIE | [2018/48] | English: | REFRACTORY MULTILAYER SHEET | [2018/48] | French: | FEUILLE MULTICOUCHE RÉFRACTAIRE | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2018 | Translation filed | 09.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 12.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | IT | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | NL | 30.03.2022 | PL | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SE | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/35] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH11270019 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0013] * [I] 2; | [XI]EP2664457 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0078] * * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0074] * [I] 2,5,7; | [X]EP2919986 (FIRESTONE BUILDING PROD CO LLC [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * claims 1-7 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] ** paragraph [0062] * | International search | [XY]JPH11270019 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-7 * , paragraphs [0001], [0073], [0078] to [0079], [0082], [0085] to [0086], [0089], [0094] to [0096]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 2; | [A]JP2003239424 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1, 5* , paragraphs [0009] to [0017], [0019] to [0034], [0049], [0063] to [0065], [0074]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007138403 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1, 4, 7 * , claims; paragraphs [0012] to [0015], [0017], [0019], [0028], [0033] to [0034]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008208625 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1, 5 * , paragraphs [0001], [0011], [0015], [0046], [0051], [0053]; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009215721 (ASHIMORI IND CO LTD) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0001], [0028], [0030] to [0035]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015129436 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1, 4, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0015] to [0021], [0035]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * |